Haig v. Dartmouth-Hitchcock Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Haig
Defendant: Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic, Dartmouth-Hitchcok Medical Center, Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital, Dartmouth-Hitchcock Health and Dartmouth-Hitchcock Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2019cv00179
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic, Dartmouth-Hitchcock Health, Dartmouth-Hitchcock Medical Center, Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital.(Pandolph, William)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Assented-To Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Dartmouth-Hitchcock Medical Center, Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic, Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital, and Dartmouth-Hitchcock Health answer due 12/2/2019. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 11/27/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (eh)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 ASSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic, Dartmouth-Hitchcock Health, Dartmouth-Hitchcock Medical Center, Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital.(Pandolph, William)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Assented-To Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dartmouth-Hitchcock Medical Center, Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic, Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital, and Dartmouth-Hitchcock Health answer due 11/27/2019. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 11/7/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (eh)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 ASSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic, Dartmouth-Hitchcock Health, Dartmouth-Hitchcock Medical Center, Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital.(Pandolph, William)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrew Haig re #4 Summons Returned Executed, #5 Summons Returned Executed, #7 Summons Returned Executed, #6 Summons Returned Executed.(Vitt, Geoffrey)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Dartmouth-Hitchcock Health served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019.(Vitt, Geoffrey)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019.(Vitt, Geoffrey)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019.(Vitt, Geoffrey)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Dartmouth-Hitchcock Medical Center served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019.(Vitt, Geoffrey)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrew Haig re #2 Consent to Direct Assignment.(Vitt, Geoffrey)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Andrew Haig (Vitt, Geoffrey)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dartmouth-Hitchcock Medical Center, Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic, Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital, and Dartmouth-Hitchcock Health filed by Andrew Haig. Summonses issued. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haig v. Dartmouth-Hitchcock Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic
Represented By: William D. Pandolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dartmouth-Hitchcok Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital
Represented By: William D. Pandolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dartmouth-Hitchcock Health
Represented By: William D. Pandolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dartmouth-Hitchcock Medical Center
Represented By: William D. Pandolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Haig
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Vitt, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?