Rheaume v. Touchette
Petitioner: Allen Rheaume
Respondent: Michael Touchette
Case Number: 2:2019cv00211
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 24 SECOND ADDENDUM re: #6 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Allen Rheaume. (kp)
December 23, 2019 Filing 23 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENTS re: #6 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Allen Rheaume. (Attachments: #1 56-2-15 Frcv Docketing Statement, #2 100-3-18 Frcv Docketing Statement) (eh)
December 16, 2019 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENTS re: #6 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Allen Rheaume. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 24, #2 Exhibit 25, #3 State v. Millard, #4 Everett v. Commonwealth) (eh)
December 16, 2019 Filing 21 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENTS re: #6 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Allen Rheaume. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23, #2 Petitioner's Exhibit List) (eh)
December 16, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Second Addendum to Petitioner's #12 Objection as to #5 Report and Recommendation filed by Allen Rheaume.(jbr)
December 10, 2019 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT re: #6 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Allen Rheaume. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26) (eh)
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENTS re: #6 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Allen Rheaume. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit 15, #3 Exhibit 16, #4 Exhibit 17, #5 Exhibit 18) (eh)
December 6, 2019 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT re: #6 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Allen Rheaume. (Attachment(s): #1 Exhibit 22) (eh).
December 6, 2019 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENTS re: #6 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Allen Rheaume. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20, #2 Exhibit 21) (eh)
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT re: #6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Allen Rheaume. (Attachment(s: #1 Exhibit 19) (eh).
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 ERRATA re: #10 Memorandum in Support of #6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Allen Rheaume. (eh)
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendation re: #6 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Allen Rheaume. (Attachments: #1 Addendum) (pac) Link added on 12/9/2019 (law).
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT(S) re: #6 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Allen Rheaume. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13, #2 Exhibit 14, #3 The Vermont Supreme Court's Unforseeable Interpretation of 13 VSA 2601)(law)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re: #6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Allen Rheaume. (eh)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT (Exhibit 12) re: #6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Allen Rheaume. (eh)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT(S) re: #6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Allen Rheaume. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 6) (eh) Text clarified on 11/25/2019 (eh).
November 22, 2019 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT (Exhibit 11) re: #6 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Allen Rheaume. (eh)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT(S) re: #6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Allen Rheaume. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 10) (eh) Text clarified on 11/25/2019 (eh).
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Allen Rheaume. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (eh) Document type clarified on 11/25/2019 (eh).
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Petitioner's #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. However, it is recommended that the court find Petitioner's current Petition under 28 U.S.C. 2254 attached to #1 as doc. 1-3 to be second or successive under 28 U.S.C. 2244(b), and TRANSFER the Petition to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit. ORDERED: Petitioner's #3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED as moot. Objections to R&R due by 12/9/2019. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 11/20/2019. (eh) Text clarified on 12/4/2019 (eh).
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re: #1 -3 Proposed Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Allen Rheaume. (eh)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Allen Rheaume. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (hbc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Allen Rheaume. (hbc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Allen Rheaume. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Allen Rheaume, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Petition (image is sealed)) (hbc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rheaume v. Touchette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Touchette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Allen Rheaume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?