Cargo Service Express C.S.E. SRL A Socia Unico v. Northern Power Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cargo Service Express C.S.E. SRL A Socia Unico
Defendant: Northern Power Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00212
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Northern Power Systems, Inc. by Cargo Service Express C.S.E. SRL A Socia Unico (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Long, Daniel) Event/text clarified on 12/30/2019 (law).
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY OF DEFAULT By Clerk as to Northern Power Systems, Inc. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/17/2019. (jam)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Northern Power Systems, Inc. re #1 Complaint by Cargo Service Express C.S.E. SRL A Socia Unico (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Daniel R. Long, Esq.)(Long, Daniel)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Northern Power Systems, Inc. served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019.(Long, Daniel)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Cargo Service Express C.S.E. SRL A Socia Unico. (law)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Northern Power Systems, Inc. filed by Cargo Service Express C.S.E. SRL A Socia Unico.Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cargo Service Express C.S.E. SRL A Socia Unico v. Northern Power Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cargo Service Express C.S.E. SRL A Socia Unico
Represented By: Daniel R. Long, Esq.
Represented By: David M. Pocius, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Power Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?