Shapiro v. United States Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Robert E. Shapiro
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and United States Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv00238
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 2/10/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
January 29, 2020 Filing 5 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by United States Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Turner, Jason)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #3 Acknowledgment/Acceptance of Service filed by Robert E. Shapiro. Docket text has been clarified to read United States Social Security Administration served on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (jlh)
January 14, 2020 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE. United States Social Security Administration served on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sherman, Justin) Answer due date corrected on 1/16/2020 (jlh).
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin G. Sherman, Esq. on behalf of Robert E. Shapiro. (pac)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Social Security Administration filed by Robert E. Shapiro. Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac) Deft name clarified on 12/23/2019 (law).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shapiro v. United States Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Social Security Administration
Represented By: Jason M. Turner, AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Shapiro
Represented By: Emily J. Joselson, Esq.
Represented By: Justin G. Sherman, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?