Alpino Rodrigues v. McAleenan et al
Petitioner: Rosangela Sabina Alpino Rodrigues
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan, Denis Renaud and Daniel M. Renaud
Case Number: 2:2019cv00240
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: On December 26, 2019, Petitioner filed an Amended Complaint and a motion to withdraw the original Complaint on the basis that she "no longer sees a need to pursue the complaint at this time and seeks to withdraw [it]." (Doc. 8 at 2.) The court granted Petitioner's motion to withdraw her Complaint on the same day, and the Amended Complaint was docketed shortly thereafter. Pursuant to Petitioner's motion to withdraw, the Amended Complaint is WITHDRAWN and the case is CLOSED. (This is a text-only Order.) Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 12/30/2019. (ejh)
December 26, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Mandamus Relief against Kevin McAleenan, Daniel M. Renaud filed by Rosangela Sabina Alpino Rodrigues. (pac)
December 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #8 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Complaint for Injunctive and Mandamus Relief, #2 Emergency Motion for Stay of Removal, #3 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Rosangela Sabina Alpino Rodrigues. The main document and Appendix A were uploaded as a singular PDF. They have been broken apart and reattached to the docket. They are now separately attached to Document #8 and this entry. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A) (law)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Withdraw #1 Complaint for Injunctive and Mandamus Relief, #3 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order During the Pendency of Emergency Motion for Stay of Removal, #2 Emergency Motion for Stay of Removal. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 12/26/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (law)
December 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Complaint for Injunctive and Mandamus Relief, #2 Emergency Motion for Stay of Removal, #3 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Rosangela Sabina Alpino Rodrigues.(Nowotny, Gerald) Links added on 12/26/2019 (law). (Main Document 8 and Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2019: #1 Appendix A) (law).
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing re: #2 EMERGENCY MOTION for Stay of Removal, #3 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order During the Pendency of Emergency Motion for Stay of Removal. Motion Hearing set for 12/30/2019 at 03:00 PM in Burlington Courtroom 542 before Judge Christina Reiss.(jbr)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed on 12/20/2019 as to US Attorney only. (pac) Date executed added on 12/26/2019 (law).
December 20, 2019 ISSUED Summons as to Daniel Renaud.(kac)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion of Gerald R. Nowotny, Esq. for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 12/20/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Waive Presence at Hearings filed by Rosangela Sabina Alpino Rodrigues.(law)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Gerald R. Nowotny filed by Rosangela Sabina Alpino Rodrigues. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Gerald R. Nowotny, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order During the Pendency of Emergency Motion for Stay of Removal filed by Rosangela Sabina Alpino Rodrigues.(law)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION for Stay of Removal filed by Rosangela Sabina Alpino Rodrigues.(law)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Mandamus Relief filed by Kevin McAleenan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alpino Rodrigues v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Denis Renaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel M. Renaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rosangela Sabina Alpino Rodrigues
Represented By: Gerald R. Nowotny, Esq.
Represented By: Erin Jacobsen, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?