Barker v. Jindall
Plaintiff: Robert A. Barker
Defendant: Ankush Jindall
Case Number: 2:2019cv00244
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Ankush Jindall of Filing #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal) (originally filed 01/02/2020 in state court)(kp)
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY REGARDING MOTION granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ankush Jindall answer due 12/27/2019. Signed by Judge Robert A. Mello on 10/8/2019. (originally filed 10/08/2019 in state court) (kp)
January 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Small Claims Complaint filed by Ankush Jindall. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (originally filed 10/04/2019 in state court)(kp)
January 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary F. Karnedy, Esq on behalf of Ankush Jindall. (originally filed 10/04/2019 in state court)(kp)
January 13, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert A. Barker re #6 Small Claims Complaint. (originally filed 09/25/2019 in state court)(kp)
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 SMALL CLAIMS COMPLAINT against Ankush Jindall filed by Robert A. Barker. (originally filed 09/18/2019 in state court) (kp)
January 13, 2020 Filing 5 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (kp)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Substitute Party United States of America as Defendant filed by Ankush Jindall.(Weathers-Lowin, Benjamin). Added MOTION to Substitute Party on 1/6/2020 (law).
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ankush Jindall re #1 Notice of Removal.(Weathers-Lowin, Benjamin)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Franklin Unit requesting original case file and certified docket sheet. (law)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ankush Jindall from Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Franklin Unit, case number 346-9-19 Frsc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barker v. Jindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ankush Jindall
Represented By: Benjamin Weathers-Lowin, AUSA
Represented By: Gary F. Karnedy, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?