CFGAdvance, LLC v. AgileCap, LLC
Plaintiff: CFGAdvance, LLC
Defendant: AgileCap, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00043
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against AgileCap, LLC filed by CFGAdvance, LLC.(kp)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING #28 Second Motion to Amend/Correct the Complaint. No opposition filed. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 7/22/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SECOND MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by CFGAdvance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Amended Complaint - redline version)(Safar, Claudine)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 OPINION AND ORDER granting #14 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim; granting #24 MOTION to Strike #23 Sur-Reply to Motion and grants Plaintiff leave to amend its Complaint within twenty (20) days of the date of this Opinion and Order consistent with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and this court's Local Rules. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 6/8/2021. (kp)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY to Response to #24 MOTION to Strike #23 Sur-Reply to Motion , or, in the alternative MOTION for Leave to File a Response re: #14 Motion to Dismiss filed by AgileCap, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Daniel)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Strike #23 Sur-Reply to Motion , or, in the alternative MOTION for Leave to File a Response re: #14 Motion to Dismiss filed by CFGAdvance, LLC. (Chorba, Christian)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Strike #23 Sur-Reply to Motion , or, in the alternative MOTION for Leave to File a Response re: #14 Motion to Dismiss filed by AgileCap, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Daniel). Added MOTION for Leave to File and link on 12/28/2020 (law).
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUR-REPLY to #14 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by CFGAdvance, LLC. (Chorba, Christian)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #20 Consented-to Motion to Exceed Page Limit of Reply re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim . Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 12/1/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh) Link added on 12/2/2020 (jlh).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY to Response to #14 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by AgileCap, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Daniel)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CONSENTED-TO MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Reply re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by AgileCap, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Daniel) Link added on 11/30/2020 (law)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by CFGAdvance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Chorba, Christian)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #17 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #14 Motion to Dismiss #6 Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 11/9/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by CFGAdvance, LLC.(Safar, Claudine)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 10/15/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by AgileCap, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Daniel)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by AgileCap, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Daniel)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by AgileCap, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Daniel)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Second Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Amended Complaint. AgileCap, LLC's Answer is due 10/8/2020. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 10/5/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SECOND STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Amended Complaint filed by AgileCap, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Daniel)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #6 Amended Complaint. AgileCap, LLC answer due 10/5/2020. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 8/19/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (law)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Amended Complaint filed by AgileCap, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Daniel)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hillary A. Borcherding, Esq on behalf of AgileCap, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Borcherding, Hillary)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel J. Martin, Esq on behalf of AgileCap, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Daniel)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AgileCap, LLC filed by CFGAdvance, LLC.(kp)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Unopposed Motion to Amend #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 8/3/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint filed by CFGAdvance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Redlined Proposed Amended Complaint)(Chorba, Christian)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #2 Summons Returned Executed. The party served has been clarified and docket text has been corrected to read: AgileCap, LLC answer due 5/7/2020. (law)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. AgileCap, LLC served on 4/16/2020, answer due 5/7/2020.(Safar, Claudine) Party served clarified on 5/18/2020 (law).
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ISSUED Summons as to AgileCap, LLC.(law)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AgileCap, LLC filed by CFGAdvance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jbr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CFGAdvance, LLC v. AgileCap, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CFGAdvance, LLC
Represented By: Christian S. Chorba, Esq.
Represented By: Claudine C. Safar, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AgileCap, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Martin, Esq.
Represented By: Hillary A. Borcherding, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?