Barnes et al v. 309 Rte 100 Dover LLC et al
Appellee: NEC Financial Services, LLC, LPV, 15-Hermitage, LLC, Vermont Department of Taxes, Hermitage Member Group, Inc., QR Hospitality, Wilmington, Town of, Bobbi Resek, Ad Hoc Committee of Unsecured Creditor/Members of Hermitage Inn Real Estate Holding Company LLC and The Hermitage Club, LLC, Rob Krzanowski, Suburban Propane, L.P., Boyne USA, Inc., Charles Collins, 309 Rte 100 Dover LLC, Reinhart FoodService, L.L.C., Bouyne USA, Inc., Jennifer Goodman, Carol H. Butler Trust, HSM Partners, LLC, U.S. Trustee, Seth Goodman, TFT Holdings, LLC, Hermitage Inn Real Estate Holding Company, LLC, Chad Bullock, Gary Rothschild, Obuchowski Law Office, Nicole Bodoh, Rose Stewart Dickson, Mark Brett, Plimpton Excavating LLC, Cold Brook Fire District, Lakeland Bank, N.A., Berkshire Bank, RTM Capital Partners, Inc., John Santaniello, Tyler Dickson, Shaun P. Golden, Robert Balewicz, Joseph Willen, Bruce Theuerkauf, Matthew Curtis, Bettina Bosma, Restrutured Opportunity Investors, Inc., Thomas Doyle, John Durkee, Williams Scotsman Inc., Hermitage Inn, LLC, Dan Solaz, Hermitage Club, LLC, Boxer Blake & Moore PLLC, Neubert, Pepe & Monteith, P.C., Deborah Strawn-Perkins, Terry Perkins, Louis Chenevart, Elliot Cooperstone, AW Realty LLC, Ana Cladera, Barnstormer Summit Lift, LLC, FTI Consulting, Inc. and Rainmaker Mountain, LLC
Trustee: Raymond J. Obuchowski
Appellant: James R. Barnes
Case Number: 2:2020cv00058
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal for Mootness filed by Hermitage Member Group, Inc..(Haley, Peter) Text clarified on 6/9/2020 (law).
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by James R. Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James R Barnes in Support)(Whittington, W.)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter J. Haley, Esq on behalf of Hermitage Member Group, Inc..(Haley, Peter)
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 BANKRUPTCY APPEAL Record Received. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation of Items to Be Included in the Record on Appeal, #2 Appellee's Designation of Additional Items to Be Included in the Record on Appeal, #3 Document 1 Chapter 7 Involuntary Petition Against a Non-Individual, #4 Document 3 Amended Page 1 of Involuntary Petition, #5 Document 7 Emergency Motion Under 11 USC Section 303(f) to Keep State Court Appointed Receiver in Place, #6 Document 9 Order Authorizing Shortened Notice, # 7 Document 14 Supplement to Emergency Motion Under 11 USC 303(f), #7 Document 14 Supplement to Emergency Motion Under 11 USC Section 303(f) to Keep State Court Appointed Receiver in Place, #8 Document 78 Statement Regarding Debtors' Schedules A/B, D and E/F, #9 Document 91 Memorandum of Decision Determining Vermont to be the Proper Venue, #10 Document 92 Order Determining Vermont to be the Proper Venue, #11 Document 205 Notice to File Claims, #12 Document 207 Court Notice and Certificate of Notice, #13 Document 253 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) and Motion for Emergency Hearing and Request for Shortened Notice, #14 Document 254 Motion for Emergency Hearing and Request for Shortened Notice for Hearing for Approval of Bid Procedures for Sale of Personal Property (snow guns); Approval of Break Up Fee and Reimbursement of Reasonable Expenses; approval of Notices and Scheduling Auction and Hearing for Approval of Sale, #15 Document 256 Stipulation and Consent Order, #16 Document 259 Order Granting Motion for an Emergency Hearing, on Shortened Notice, #17 Document 260 Order Approving Stipulation, #18 Document 264 Order Approving Bidding Procedures for Proposed Sale (snow guns and related equipment), #19 Document 284 Notice of Qualified Bidder, Seven Springs Mountain Resort, Inc., for Participation in Auction and Sale Hearing, #20 Document 287 Notice of Qualified Bidder, Alterra Mountain Company U.S. Inc., for Participation in Auction and Sale Hearing, #21 Document 293 Order Approving Sale (re: snow guns and related equipment), #22 Document 324 Motion for Order re: bidding procedures for sale of certain real estate, furniture, furnishings, fixtures and equipment, including, without limitation, ski lifts, all of which are located in Wilmington and Dover, Vermont, #23 Document 325 Motion for Order re: bidding procedures for sale of a Dopplemayr Barnstormer 6-Cld chair lift with detachable bubble chairs and associated equipment located in Wilmington, Vermont, #24 Document 328 Notice of Motion and Hearing on Motion for Substantive Consolidation, #25 Document 329 Certificate of Service re: ECF #325 Motion (NEF participants and interested parties), #26 Document 330 Certificate of Service re: ECF #324 Motion (NEF participants and interested parties), #27 Document 331 Certificate of Service re: ECF #324, 325, 326 (matrix), #28 Document 333 Certificate of Service re: ECF 324, 325 (holders of liens and encumberances in Schedule B), #29 Document 337 Stipulation and Consent Order Between Berkshire Bank and Raymond J. Obuchowski, Trustee, #30 Document 338 Joint Stipulation and Consent Order Between Barnstormer Summit Lift LLC and Raymond Obuchowski, Trustee, #31 Document 341 Order Granting Stipulation and Consent Order Between Barnstormer Summit Lift LLC and Raymond J. Obuchowski, Trustee, #32 Document 344 Order Granting Stipulation and Consent Order Between Berkshire Bank and Raymond J. Obuchowski, Trustee, #33 Document 347 Limited Objection to Chapter 7 Trustee's Motions For Orders to (I) Approve Bidding Procedures For Proposed Sales Of Assets; (II) Approve Break-Up Fees; (III) Scheduling An Auction; and (IV) Scheduling A Sale Hearing For Approval Of Sale Of Assets, #34 Document 350 Limited Objection of Boyne Asset Purchase Agreement, #35 Document 351 Objection to Stipulation and Consent Order Between Barnstormer Summit Lift LLC and Raymond J. Obuchowski, Trustee, #36 Document 353 Objection to Motions for Approval of Bidding Procedures Orders, #37 Document 356 Opposition to Trustee's Motion to Approve Bid Procedures and Joinder to Limited Objection, #38 Document 365 Notice of Additional Parties with Interest in Sale of Estate Assets, #39 Document 376 Order Upon Trustee's Motion For Substantive Consolidation, #40 Document 377 Order Upon Trustee's Motion For Substantive Consolidation, #41 Document 381 Notice of Revised Real Estate Purchase Agreement Under Motion to Sell, #42 Document 382 Notice of Revised Asset Purchase Agreement Under Motion to Sell, #43 Document 383 Notice of Retention by Berkshire Bank of Auction Company to Market Property, #44 Document 384 Stipulated Motion and Consent Order Between Reinhart Foodservice, L.L.C., Berkshire Bank and Raymond J. Obuchowski, Trustee, #45 Document 385 Order Granting Stipulated Motion and Consent Order Between Reinhart Foodservice, LLC, Berkshire Band and Raymond J. Obuchowski, Trustee, #46 Document 386 Stipulated Motion and Amended Stipulation and Consent Order Between Berkshire Bank and Raymond J. Obuchowski, Trustee, #47 Document 387 Stipulated Motion and Amended Stipulation and Consent Order Between Barnstormer Summit Lift LLC and Raymond J. Obuchowski, Trustee, #48 Document 388 Order Granting Amended Stipulation Between Berkshire Bank and Raymond J. Obuchowski, Trustee, #49 Document 389 Order Granting Amended Stipulation Between Barnstormer Summit Lift, LLC and Raymond J. Obuchowski, Trustee, #50 Document 390 Notice and Form of Asset Purchase and Sale Agreement for Lot 3 Under Motions to Sell, #51 Document 391 Proposed Order re: certain real estate, furniture, furnishings, fixtures and equipment, including, without limitation, ski lifts, (excluding the Barnstormer Lift) all of which are located in Wilmington and Dover, Vermont, #52 Document 392 Proposed Order re: Dopplemayr Barnstormer 6-Cld Chair Lift, #53 Document 397 Order Approving Bidding Procedures for Proposed Sale of a Dopplemayr Barnstormer 6-CLD Chair Lift with Detachable Bubble Chairs and Associated Equipment Located in Wilmington, Vermont, #54 Document 398 Order Approving Bidding Procedures for Proposed Sale of Certain Real Estate, Furniture, Furnishings, Fixtures and Equipment, Including, Without Limitation, Ski Lifts (excluding the Dopplemayr Barnstormer Lift), All of Which are Located in Wilmington and Dover, Vermont, #55 Document 399 Notice of Proposed Sale, Bidding Procedures, Auction Date and Sale Hearing, #56 Document 400 Notice of Summary Notice of Proposed Sale, Bidding Procedures, Auction Date and Sale Hearing, #57 Document 401 Certificate of Service re: ECF 397, 398, 399, 400 (NEF recipients, secured parties and list of interested parties), #58 Document 402 Certificate of Service re: ECF 400 (revised mailing matrix with omission of service on recipients with returend mail addresses), #59 Document 403 Certificate of Service re: ECF 324, 325, 397, 398, 399, #60 Document 406 Certificate of Notice by Bankruptcy Notice Center re: ECF 397 Order, #61 Document 407 Certificate of Notice by Bankruptcy Noticing Center re: 398 Order, #62 Document 413 Notice of Qualified Bid Protocol For Potential Bidders Under Motions To Sell, #63 Document 414 Notice of Addendum to Form of Asset Purchase and Sale Agreement for Lot 3 under Motions to Sell, #64 Document 415 Certificate of Service of Notices ECF #413 & ECF #414 upon NEF recipients, lien creditors, and parties of interest by electronic mail (email), #65 Document 416 Notice of Addendum to Form of Revised Real Estate Asset Purchase and Sale Agreement for Lot 1, #66 Document 417 Certificate of Service of Notice of Addendum to Form of Revised Real Estate Asset Purchase and Sale Agreement for Lot 1, #67 Document 418 Certificate of Service of Bid Procedure on list of parties by first class mail USPS, #68 Document 422 Motion for Emergency Hearing to Set New Deadlines and Bidding Dates for Substantially All of Debtors' Assets, #69 Document 426 Objection to Emergency Motion of James R. Barnes to Set New Deadlines for Registration of Qualified Bidders and For Auction of Substantially All of the Debtors' Assets, #70 Document 428 Order Granting Motion for an Emergency Hearing on Motion to Modify the Deadline for Qualified Bids and the Date of the Auction of Substantially All of the Debtors' Assets, #71 Document 430 Objection to Emergency Motion of James R. Barnes To Set New Deadlines for Registration of Qualified Bidders And For Auction Of Substantially All Of Debtors' Assets, #72 Document 431 Objection to Motion to Continue Sale Hearing, #73 Document 432 Objection to Emergency Motion to Set New Deadlines for Registration of Qualified Bidders and For Auction of Substantially All of the Debtors' Assets, #74 Document 433 Joinder in Support of Objections to Emergency Motion to Set New Deadlines for Registration of Qualified Bidders and for Auction of Substantially All of Debtors' Assets, #75 Document 434 Notice of Objection to Emergency Motion to Set New Deadlines for Registration of Qualified Bidders and for Auction of Substantially All of Debtors' Assets, #76 Document 437 Order Denying Motion to Set New Deadlines for Bidding, Auction, and Sale Hearing and Sustaining All Objections to that Motion, #77 Document 438 Order Denying Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal, #78 Document 439 Notice of Qualified Bidder (Hermitage Club Member Group Inc.) for Participation in Auction and Sale Hearing regarding Lot 3, #79 Document 440 Certificate of Service of Notice of Qualified Bidder for Lot 3 (Hermitage Club Membership Group), #80 Document 441 Affidavit of Trustee in Support of Sale of Estate Property, #81 Document 442 Affidavit of Harold J. Bordwin, #82 Document 443 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #83 Document 444 Certificate of Notice by Bankruptcy Noticing Center Re: ECF 428 Order to Set Hearing, #84 Document 445 Affidavit of Harold J. Bordwin, #85 Document 448 Declaration in Support of Bid of Hermitage Club Member Group, Inc., #86 Document 454 Certificate of Notice re: ECF 437 Order, #87 Document 455 Certificate of Notice re: ECF 438 Order, #88 Document 456 Certificate of Notice re: ECF 449 Order, #89 Document 457 Certificate re: ECF 447 Order, #90 Document 462 Order Approving Trustee's Sale o
May 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY REMOVAL: Document 2 removed as entered in the incorrect case. (law)
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 Entry removed from the docket
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL RECEIVED From Bankruptcy Court. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-10214. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Transmission of Notice of Appeal from USBC-VT)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes et al v. 309 Rte 100 Dover LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: NEC Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: Tavian M. Mayer, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LPV, 15-Hermitage, LLC
Represented By: Hobart F. Popick
Represented By: Erin Miller Heins, Esq.
Represented By: Robert L. Rattet, Esq.
Represented By: Kevin J. McEleney, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Vermont Department of Taxes
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Hannon, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Hermitage Member Group, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew C. Helman, Esq.
Represented By: Peter J. Haley, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: QR Hospitality
Represented By: David S. Anderson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wilmington, Town of
Represented By: Edward G. Adrian, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bobbi Resek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ad Hoc Committee of Unsecured Creditor/Members of Hermitage Inn Real Estate Holding Company LLC and The Hermitage Club, LLC
Represented By: Andre D. Bouffard, Esq.
Represented By: Patrick M. Birney, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rob Krzanowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Suburban Propane, L.P.
Represented By: Donald F. Hayes, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Boyne USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob A. Manheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Charles Collins
Represented By: Robert S. DiPalma, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: 309 Rte 100 Dover LLC
Represented By: Raymond J. Obuchowski, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Reinhart FoodService, L.L.C.
Represented By: Adam Mordecai, Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Weiner, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bouyne USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob A. Manheimer
Represented By: Michelle M. Kainen, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jennifer Goodman
Represented By: Robert S. DiPalma, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Carol H. Butler Trust
Represented By: David M. Pocius, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HSM Partners, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Snow, Esq.
Represented By: William H. Meub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Lisa M Penpraze
Represented By: Amy J. Ginsberg, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Seth Goodman
Represented By: Robert S. DiPalma, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TFT Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Robert S. DiPalma, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Hermitage Inn Real Estate Holding Company, LLC
Represented By: Thomas P. Simon, Esq.
Represented By: Douglas S. Skalka, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Chad Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gary Rothschild
Represented By: Merrill E. Bent, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Obuchowski Law Office
Represented By: Raymond J. Obuchowski, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Nicole Bodoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rose Stewart Dickson
Represented By: Robert S. DiPalma, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mark Brett
Represented By: Hobart F. Popick
Represented By: Erin Miller Heins, Esq.
Represented By: Robert L. Rattet, Esq.
Represented By: Kevin J. McEleney, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Plimpton Excavating LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Cold Brook Fire District
Represented By: John J. Kennelly, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lakeland Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Erin J. Kennedy, Esq.
Represented By: Heather Z. Cooper, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Berkshire Bank
Represented By: Scott A. McQuilkin, Esq.
Represented By: William S. Fish, Esq.
Represented By: James B. Anderson, Esq.
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Glynn, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RTM Capital Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Hobart F. Popick
Represented By: Erin Miller Heins, Esq.
Represented By: Robert L. Rattet, Esq.
Represented By: Kevin J. McEleney, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John Santaniello
Represented By: Stephen L. Cusick, Esq.
Represented By: Douglas S. Zucker, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Tyler Dickson
Represented By: Robert S. DiPalma, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Shaun P. Golden
Represented By: Shannon A. Bertrand, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Robert Balewicz
Represented By: Stephen L. Cusick, Esq.
Represented By: Douglas S. Zucker, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Joseph Willen
Represented By: Leslie A. Berkoff, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bruce Theuerkauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Matthew Curtis
Represented By: Robert L. Rattet, Esq.
Represented By: Kevin J. McEleney, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bettina Bosma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Restrutured Opportunity Investors, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Fisher
Represented By: Craig I. Fifland, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Thomas Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John Durkee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Williams Scotsman Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Hermitage Inn, LLC
Represented By: Raymond J. Obuchowski, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dan Solaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Hermitage Club, LLC
Represented By: Douglas S. Skalka, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Boxer Blake & Moore PLLC
Represented By: Oliver A. Abbott, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Neubert, Pepe & Monteith, P.C.
Represented By: Douglas S. Skalka, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Deborah Strawn-Perkins
Represented By: Heather Z. Cooper, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Terry Perkins
Represented By: Heather Z. Cooper, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Louis Chenevart
Represented By: C. Donald Neville, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Elliot Cooperstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: AW Realty LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Snow, Esq.
Represented By: Brian M. Clarke, Esq.
Represented By: William H. Meub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ana Cladera
Represented By: Robert S. DiPalma, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Barnstormer Summit Lift, LLC
Represented By: David N. Dunn, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FTI Consulting, Inc.
Represented By: Heather E. Ross, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rainmaker Mountain, LLC
Represented By: Heather Z. Cooper, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Raymond J. Obuchowski
Represented By: Raymond J. Obuchowski, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: James R. Barnes
Represented By: W. E. Whittington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?