Jenkins v. United States Department of Justice
Plaintiff: Janet Jenkins
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 2:2020cv00059
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend #4 Amended Complaint With Written Consent filed by Janet Jenkins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diego A. Soto, #2 Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Second Amended Complaint Redline Version)(Langrock, Frank)
June 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #8 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. The dates in the docket entry have been clarified. It now reads: United States Department of Justice served on 6/1/2020, answer due 7/31/2020. (law)
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. United States Department of Justice served on 6/1/2020, answer due 7/31/2020.(Langrock, Frank) Dates clarified on 6/9/2020 (law).
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 5/27/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae) (entry updated to include the ruling on 5/27/2020)(jam).
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by United States Department of Justice.(Turner, Jason)
May 20, 2020 ISSUED Summons as to United States Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.(law)
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #4 Amended Complaint filed by Janet Jenkins. Exhibit 3 was omitted at the time of filing. The exhibit is now attached to #4 and this entry. (law)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice filed by Janet Jenkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(jam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2020: #3 Exhibit 3) (law). Text clarified on 5/19/2020 (law).
May 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #2 Summons Returned Executed. Docket text has been corrected to read United States Department of Justice served on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (law)
May 15, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. United States Department of Justice served on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Langrock, Frank) Text clarified on 5/15/2020 (law).
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice filed by Janet Jenkins.Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Jenkins
Represented By: Frank H. Langrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Jason M. Turner, AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?