Shat Acres Highland Cattle, LLC et al v. American Highland Cattle Association
Plaintiff: Ray Shatney, Shat Acres Highland Cattle, LLC and Janet Steward
Defendant: American Highland Cattle Association
Case Number: 2:2020cv00062
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: American Highland Cattle Association waiver sent on 4/30/2020, answer due 6/29/2020.(Freeman, Robin)
May 11, 2020 Filing 2 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Shat Acres Highland Cattle, LLC, Ray Shatney, Janet Steward (Freeman, Robin)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Highland Cattle Association filed by Shat Acres Highland Cattle, LLC, Janet Steward, Ray Shatney. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shat Acres Highland Cattle, LLC et al v. American Highland Cattle Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Shatney
Represented By: Robin A. Freeman, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shat Acres Highland Cattle, LLC
Represented By: Robin A. Freeman, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Steward
Represented By: Robin A. Freeman, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Highland Cattle Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?