Co-Operative Insurance Companies v. Broan-Nutone, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Co-Operative Insurance Companies
Defendant: Broan-Nutone, LLC and Nu-Tone, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00107
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Broan-Nutone, LLC waiver sent on 9/4/2020, answer due 11/3/2020; Nu-Tone, Inc. waiver sent on 9/4/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Mordecai, Adam) Text clarified on 10/1/2020 (law).
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dennis A. First. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 9/30/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dennis A. First, Esq. filed by Broan-Nutone, LLC, Nu-Tone, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit of Dennis A. First, Esq., #3 Proposed Order)(law)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Broan-Nutone, LLC, Nu-Tone, Inc. filed by Co-Operative Insurance Companies.Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Co-Operative Insurance Companies v. Broan-Nutone, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan-Nutone, LLC
Represented By: Dennis A. First, Esq.
Represented By: P. Baird Joslin, Jr., Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nu-Tone, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis A. First, Esq.
Represented By: P. Baird Joslin, Jr., Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Co-Operative Insurance Companies
Represented By: Adam Mordecai, Esq.
Represented By: Ryan M. Long, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?