Reis v. Ben & Jerry's Homemade, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Paul F. Reis
Defendant: Ben & Jerry's Homemade, Inc., State of VT Dept of Labor, Liberty Mutual Insurance and Vermont Department of Labor
Case Number: 2:2020cv00119
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ben & Jerry's Homemade, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance, Vermont Department of Labor filed by Paul F. Reis. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 CASE REFERRED to Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. (law)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas P. Simon, Esq on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance.(Simon, Thomas)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Ben & Jerry's Homemade, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance, Vermont Department of Labor filed by Paul F. Reis. (eh)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Plaintiff's #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall refer this case to a United States District Judge. It is recommended the court dismiss Plaintiff's #4 Complaint. Objections due within 14 days of service. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 9/15/2020. (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reis v. Ben & Jerry's Homemade, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben & Jerry's Homemade, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of VT Dept of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance
Represented By: Thomas P. Simon, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vermont Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul F. Reis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?