Smith et al v. Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc.
Plaintiff: Richard Smith and Nancy Smith
Defendant: Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc. Individually doing business as Norwalk Precast Molds and Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc. Individually and doing business as Norwalk Precast Molds
Not Classified By Court: ENE Evaluator
Case Number: 2:2020cv00127
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2022 Filing 49 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Notice of Deposition of Amended - Michael Rogers by Richard Smith.(Friter, Jordan)
December 22, 2021 Filing 48 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Notice of Deposition of Michael Rogers, PE by Richard Smith.(Friter, Jordan)
December 7, 2021 Filing 47 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Expert Disclosure by Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc..(Pocius, David)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 AMENDED STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE/ORDER granting #45 Consented-To Motion to Amend the Discovery Schedule/Order. Discovery due by 2/22/2022. Motions due by 3/11/2022. Ready for Trial by 5/11/2022. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 10/29/2021. (kp)
October 29, 2021 Filing 45 CONSENTED-TO MOTION to Amend the Discovery Schedule/Order filed by Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pocius, David)
September 1, 2021 Filing 44 REPORT of Early Neutral Evaluator.(Spink, James)
August 26, 2021 Filing 43 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Notice of Deposition of John G Green II P.E. by Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc..(Pocius, David)
April 26, 2021 Filing 42 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Response to Request to Produce (Fourth Supplemental) by Nancy Smith, Richard Smith.(Friter, Jordan)
April 26, 2021 Filing 41 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Response to Request to Produce (Third Supplemental) by Nancy Smith, Richard Smith.(Friter, Jordan)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #38 MOTION to the Discovery Schedule/Order. See doc. #39 . Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 4/16/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (jbr)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 AMENDED STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE/ORDER granting #38 JOINT MOTION to Amend the Discovery Schedule/Order. Discovery due by 11/22/2021. Motions due by 12/22/2021. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/11/2021 at 10:00 AM. Ready for Trial by 2/23/2022. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 4/16/2021. (jbr) Link added on 4/16/2021 (law).
April 15, 2021 Filing 38 JOINT MOTION to Amend the Discovery Schedule/Order filed by Nancy Smith, Richard Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Friter, Jordan)
April 13, 2021 Filing 37 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Notice of Deposition of Brian McMahon and Kevin Camp by Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc..(Pocius, David)
April 2, 2021 Filing 36 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Notice of Deposition of James Daley (Second Amended) by Nancy Smith, Richard Smith.(Friter, Jordan)
March 31, 2021 Filing 35 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Notice of Deposition of Wesley Locke and James Daley (Amended) by Nancy Smith, Richard Smith.(Friter, Jordan)
March 22, 2021 Filing 34 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Response to Request to Produce by Nancy Smith, Richard Smith.(Friter, Jordan)
March 22, 2021 Filing 33 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Notices of Deposition of Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc., James Daley, Lawrence Oakleaf and Wesley Locke by Nancy Smith, Richard Smith.(Friter, Jordan)
March 22, 2021 Filing 32 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Notices of Deposition of Larry Newton, Ricahrd Smith, Brock Wells, Nancy Smith and Travis Brosseau) by Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc. (Pocius, David)
March 1, 2021 Filing 31 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Response to Request to Produce Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Requests for Production by Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc..(Pocius, David)
February 1, 2021 Filing 30 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena to Camp Precast Concrete Products by Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc..(Pocius, David)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE/ORDER granting #28 Joint Motion to Amend the Discovery Schedule/Order - Discovery due by 9/21/2021. Motions due by 10/22/2021. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 6/11/2021 at 10:00 AM. Ready for Trial by 12/23/2021. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 1/26/2021. (kp)
January 8, 2021 Filing 28 JOINT MOTION to Amend the Discovery Schedule/Order filed by Nancy Smith, Richard Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Friter, Jordan)
January 6, 2021 Filing 27 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Request to Produce by Nancy Smith, Richard Smith.(Friter, Jordan)
December 22, 2020 Filing 26 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena to Acadia by Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc..(Pocius, David)
December 18, 2020 Filing 25 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena to Green Mountain Safety Consulting by Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc..(Pocius, David)
December 7, 2020 Filing 24 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Answer to Interrogatories and Requests to Produce by Nancy Smith, Richard Smith.(Friter, Jordan)
December 4, 2020 Filing 23 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Notice of Service of Revised Subpoena to National Precast Concrete Association by Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc..(Pocius, David)
November 19, 2020 Filing 22 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Answer to Interrogatories and Requests to Produce with document production by Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc..(Pocius, David)
November 17, 2020 Filing 21 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Notice of Service of Subpoena by Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc..(Pocius, David)
November 10, 2020 Filing 20 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Notice of Service of Subpoena by Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc..(Pocius, David)
October 30, 2020 Filing 19 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Interrogatories and Request to Produce to Plaintiffs by Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc..(Pocius, David)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion of John M. Popilock, Esq. for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 10/29/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
October 29, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John M. Popilock filed by Nancy Smith, Richard Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
October 29, 2020 Filing 16 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Notice of Service of Subpoena by Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc..(Pocius, David)
October 23, 2020 Filing 15 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Notice of Service of Subpoena by Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc..(Pocius, David)
October 21, 2020 Filing 14 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Initial Disclosures by Nancy Smith, Richard Smith.(Friter, Jordan)
October 21, 2020 Filing 13 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Interrogatories and Request to Produce by Nancy Smith, Richard Smith.(Friter, Jordan)
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Initial Disclosures (Revised) by Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc..(Pocius, David)
October 20, 2020 Filing 11 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Initial Disclosures by Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc..(Pocius, David)
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 ASSIGNED Early Neutral Evaluator: James W. Spink, Esq. (eh)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE/ORDER Discovery due by 5/21/2021. Motions due by 6/22/2021. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/5/2021 at 09:00 AM. Ready for Trial by 8/23/2021. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 10/9/2020. (jbr)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order by Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc..(Pocius, David)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion of Jordan S. Friter, Esq. for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 10/8/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jordan S. Friter filed by Nancy Smith, Richard Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc. served on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020.(Behrens, Robert)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 10/9/2020. (eh)
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc. (Pocius, David)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc..(Pocius, David)
September 3, 2020 ISSUED Summons as to Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc.(kac)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc. filed by Richard Smith, Nancy Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Smith
Represented By: Robert S. Behrens, Esq.
Represented By: Jordan S. Friter, Esq.
Represented By: John M. Popilock, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Smith
Represented By: Robert S. Behrens, Esq.
Represented By: Jordan S. Friter, Esq.
Represented By: John M. Popilock, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc. Individually doing business as Norwalk Precast Molds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norwalk Precast Molds, Inc. Individually and doing business as Norwalk Precast Molds
Represented By: David M. Pocius, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ENE Evaluator
Represented By: James W. Spink, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?