Hakansson v. Northeast Kingdom Community Action, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Hakansson
Defendant: Spates Family LLC, Northeast Kingdom Community Action, Inc. and Memphremagog Rentals, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00138
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Spates Family LLC (Boxer, Andrew)
November 4, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Memphremagog Rentals, LLC.(Lynn, Pietro)
November 3, 2020 Filing 12 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 11/20/2020. (eh)
November 2, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Spates Family LLC.(Boxer, Andrew)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Northeast Kingdom Community Action, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Windish, Richard)
October 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Pietro J. Lynn, Esq on behalf of Memphremagog Rentals, LLC.(Lynn, Pietro)
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew C. Boxer, Esq on behalf of Spates Family LLC.(Boxer, Andrew)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard J. Windish, Esq on behalf of Northeast Kingdom Community Action, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Windish, Richard)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY REMOVAL. Document 2 has been removed from the docket. The filings have been re-entered as Documents 3-5. Northeast Kingdom Community Action, Inc served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020; Spates Family LLC served on 9/17/2020, answer due 10/8/2020; Memphremagog Rentals, LLC served on 9/17/2020, answer due 10/8/2020. (jlh)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Memphremagog Rentals, LLC served on 9/17/2020, answer due 10/8/2020 .(McCabe, Daniel) Text clarified on 9/21/2020 (jlh).
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Spates Family LLC served on 9/17/2020, answer due 10/8/2020.(McCabe, Daniel) Text clarified on 9/21/2020 (jlh).
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Northeast Kingdom Community Action, Inc served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020 .(McCabe, Daniel) Text clarified on 9/21/2020 (jlh).
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 Entry has been removed from the docket.
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Northeast Kingdom Community Action, Inc., Spates Family LLC, Memphremagog Rentals, LLC filed by Cynthia Hakansson. Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hakansson v. Northeast Kingdom Community Action, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spates Family LLC
Represented By: Andrew C. Boxer, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeast Kingdom Community Action, Inc.
Represented By: Richard J. Windish, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memphremagog Rentals, LLC
Represented By: Pietro J. Lynn, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Hakansson
Represented By: Daniel D. McCabe, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?