Sanchez v. Helen Porter Nursing Home, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lisa L. Sanchez
Defendant: Helen Porter Nursing Home, Inc. doing business as The University of Vermont Health Network - Helen Porter Rehabilitation and Nursing
Case Number: 2:2020cv00153
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Helen Porter Nursing Home, Inc. (Joslin, Jr., P.)
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Helen Porter Nursing Home, Inc..(Joslin, Jr., P.)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Agreed Upon Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/20/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
October 20, 2020 Filing 4 AGREED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Helen Porter Nursing Home, Inc. (Joslin, Jr., P.)
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by P. Baird Joslin, Jr., Esq on behalf of Helen Porter Nursing Home, Inc..(Joslin, Jr., P.)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 ACKNOWLEDGMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE. Helen Porter Nursing Home, Inc. served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020.(Levins, III, James)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Helen Porter Nursing Home, Inc. filed by Lisa L. Sanchez.Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Helen Porter Nursing Home, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Porter Nursing Home, Inc. doing business as The University of Vermont Health Network - Helen Porter Rehabilitation and Nursing
Represented By: P. Baird Joslin, Jr., Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa L. Sanchez
Represented By: Nancy S. Corsones, Esq.
Represented By: James G. Levins, III, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?