Continental Casualty Company v. Herman Miller, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Continental Casualty Company
Defendant: OEU, Inc., OEU Installations, Inc., Herman Miller, Inc., Security Services of Connecticut, Inc. and Light Corp Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00172
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Continental Casualty Company re #17 Summons Returned Executed, #16 Summons Returned Executed, #15 Summons Returned Executed, #18 Summons Returned Executed.(Rose, Carey)
December 16, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Security Services of Connecticut, Inc. served on 11/16/2020.(Rose, Carey) Answer due date removed on 12/16/2020 (law).
December 16, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. OEU, Inc. served on 11/19/2020.(Rose, Carey) Answer due date removed on 12/16/2020 (law).
December 16, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Light Corp Inc. served on 11/18/2020.(Rose, Carey) Answer due date removed on 12/16/2020 (law).
December 16, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Herman Miller, Inc. served on 11/18/2020.(Rose, Carey) Answer due date removed on 12/16/2020 (law).
December 16, 2020 Filing 14 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 1/4/2021. (eh)
December 15, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Light Corp Inc. (O'Rourke, William)
December 15, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Light Corp Inc..(O'Rourke, William)
December 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William A. O'Rourke, III on behalf of Light Corp Inc..(O'Rourke, William)
December 14, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by OEU, Inc..(Ryan, Harry)
December 10, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Herman Miller, Inc..(Judge, Jr., Walter)
December 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harry R. Ryan, Esq on behalf of OEU, Inc..(Ryan, Harry)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission of Mark E. Utke, Pro Hac Vice; granting #6 Motion for Admission of Mark E. Opalisky, Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 12/1/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark E. Opalisky, Esq. filed by Continental Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Carey C. Rose, Esq., #2 Affidavit of Mark E. Opalisky, Esq., #3 List of Court Admissions, #4 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark E. Utke, Esq. filed by Continental Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Carey C. Rose, Esq., #2 Affidavit of Mark E. Utke, Esq., #3 List of Court Admissions, #4 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Security Services of Connecticut, Inc. (Shapiro, Beata)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Security Services of Connecticut, Inc..(Shapiro, Beata)
November 3, 2020 ISSUED Summons as to Herman Miller, Inc., Light Corp Inc., OEU, Inc., Security Services of Connecticut, Inc. (law)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Continental Casualty Company. (law)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Herman Miller, Inc., Light Corp Inc., OEU, Inc., Security Services of Connecticut, Inc. filed by Continental Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Continental Casualty Company v. Herman Miller, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OEU, Inc.
Represented By: Harry R. Ryan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OEU Installations, Inc.
Represented By: Harry R. Ryan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herman Miller, Inc.
Represented By: Walter E. Judge, Jr., Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Services of Connecticut, Inc.
Represented By: Beata Shapiro, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Light Corp Inc.
Represented By: William A. O'Rourke, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Carey C. Rose, Esq.
Represented By: Mark E. Opalisky, Esq.
Represented By: Mark E. Utke, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?