Gallo et al v. Arizona Beverages USA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rudy Gallo and Deborah Gallo
Defendant: Maplewood Beverage Packers, LLC and Arizona Beverages USA, LLC
Not Classified By Court: ENE Evaluator
Case Number: 2:2020cv00174
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2022 Filing 41 JUDGMENT - case DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Litigants (appeal period expires 5/18/2022))(law)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 4/18/2022. (law)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Show Cause Response due by 3/28/2022. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 3/15/2022. (law)
March 10, 2022 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Arizona Beverages USA, LLC, Maplewood Beverage Packers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shahi, Kaveh)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting as unopposed #34 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Deborah Gallo and Rudy Gallo are ordered to have replacement counsel appear or to assert self representation within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 1/27/2022. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
December 22, 2021 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deborah Gallo, Rudy Gallo re #34 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney .(Borcherding, Hillary)
December 22, 2021 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deborah Gallo, Rudy Gallo re #34 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney .(Borcherding, Hillary)
December 21, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Deborah Gallo, Rudy Gallo.(O'Neill, Jerome)
September 22, 2021 Filing 33 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed Subpoena for Western Pest Services Return filed by Deborah Gallo, Rudy Gallo(O'Neill, Jerome)
September 22, 2021 Filing 32 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed Subpoena for Ardagh MP USA, Inc. Return filed by Deborah Gallo, Rudy Gallo(O'Neill, Jerome)
September 22, 2021 Filing 31 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed Subpoena for Ardagh MP Mergeco, Inc. Return filed by Deborah Gallo, Rudy Gallo(O'Neill, Jerome)
September 22, 2021 Filing 30 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed Subpoena for Ardagh Metal Packaging USA, LLC Return filed by Deborah Gallo, Rudy Gallo(O'Neill, Jerome)
September 22, 2021 Filing 29 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed Subpoena for Ardagh Metal Beverages USA, Inc. Return filed by Deborah Gallo, Rudy Gallo(O'Neill, Jerome)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SECOND AMENDED STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE/ORDER granting #27 Stipulated Motion to Extend the Discovery Schedule/Order. Discovery due by 3/15/2022. Motions due by 4/15/2022. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 4/4/2022 at 09:00 AM. Ready for Trial by 5/15/2022. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 9/8/2021. (law)
September 3, 2021 Filing 27 STIPULATED MOTION to Extend the Discovery Schedule/Order filed by Deborah Gallo, Rudy Gallo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Borcherding, Hillary)
September 2, 2021 Filing 26 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Notice of Third-Party Subpoenas Duces Tecum by Deborah Gallo, Rudy Gallo.(Borcherding, Hillary)
July 27, 2021 Filing 25 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Supplemental Production in Response to Defendants' Discovery Requests by Deborah Gallo, Rudy Gallo.(Borcherding, Hillary)
June 29, 2021 Filing 24 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Answer to Interrogatories and Requests to Produce by Deborah Gallo, Rudy Gallo.(Borcherding, Hillary)
June 14, 2021 Filing 23 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Answer to Interrogatories and Requests to Produce (First Set and Second Set) by Arizona Beverages USA, LLC, Maplewood Beverage Packers, LLC.(Shahi, Kaveh)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 5/26/2021. (law)
May 26, 2021 Filing 21 PROPOSED Protective Order by Maplewood Beverage Packers, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shahi, Kaveh)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE/ORDER granting #19 Stipulated Motion to Extend the Discovery Schedule/Order. Discovery due by 12/1/2021. Motions due by 12/1/2021. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/20/2021 at 09:00 AM. Ready for Trial by 12/31/2021. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 4/30/2021. (law)
April 29, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATED MOTION to Extend the Discovery Schedule/Order filed by Deborah Gallo, Rudy Gallo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Borcherding, Hillary)
April 29, 2021 Filing 18 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Interrogatories and Request to Produce and Requests for Production by Arizona Beverages USA, LLC, Maplewood Beverage Packers, LLC.(Shahi, Kaveh)
April 13, 2021 Filing 17 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Interrogatories and Request to Produce (Second Sets) to Defendants by Deborah Gallo, Rudy Gallo.(Borcherding, Hillary)
March 31, 2021 Filing 16 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Interrogatories and Request to Produce to Defendants by Deborah Gallo, Rudy Gallo.(Borcherding, Hillary)
February 16, 2021 Filing 15 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Initial Disclosures by Deborah Gallo, Rudy Gallo.(O'Neill, Jerome)
February 16, 2021 Filing 14 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Initial Disclosures by Arizona Beverages USA, LLC, Maplewood Beverage Packers, LLC.(Shahi, Kaveh)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE/ORDER Discovery due by 7/30/2021. Motions due by 7/30/2021. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 5/25/2021 at 09:00 AM. Ready for Trial by 7/30/2021. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 1/25/2021. (law)
January 25, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order by Deborah Gallo, Rudy Gallo. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(O'Neill, Jerome)
December 21, 2020 Filing 11 ASSIGNED Early Neutral Evaluator: Michael J. Marks, Esq. (eh)
December 17, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION AS TO ENE by all parties. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Borcherding, Hillary)
December 4, 2020 Filing 9 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 12/21/2020. (eh)
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Case Reassignment pursuant to Local Rule 73(d). Case reassigned to Judge William K. Sessions III. Judge John M. Conroy no longer assigned to the case. (law)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 OBJECTION to Direct Assignment by Arizona Beverages USA, LLC, Maplewood Beverage Packers, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shahi, Kaveh)
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Arizona Beverages USA, LLC, Maplewood Beverage Packers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shahi, Kaveh)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filled by Deborah Gallo, Rudy Gallo. Arizona Beverages USA, LLC, Maplewood Beverage Packers, LLC served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(O'Neill, Jerome) Text clarified on 11/18/2020 (eh).
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 11/4/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (law)
November 4, 2020 REISSUED Summons(es) as to Arizona Beverages USA, LLC, Maplewood Beverage Packers, LLC.(law)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of B. Keith Williams filed by Deborah Gallo, Rudy Gallo. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of B. Keith Williams, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James R. Stocks filed by Deborah Gallo, Rudy Gallo. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James R. Stock, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arizona Beverages USA, LLC, Maplewood Beverage Packers, LLC filed by Rudy Gallo, Deborah Gallo. Summonses issued. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallo et al v. Arizona Beverages USA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudy Gallo
Represented By: Jerome F. O'Neill, Esq.
Represented By: Hillary A. Borcherding, Esq.
Represented By: B. Keith Williams, Esq.
Represented By: James R. Stocks, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Gallo
Represented By: Jerome F. O'Neill, Esq.
Represented By: Hillary A. Borcherding, Esq.
Represented By: B. Keith Williams, Esq.
Represented By: James R. Stocks, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maplewood Beverage Packers, LLC
Represented By: Kaveh S. Shahi, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Beverages USA, LLC
Represented By: Kaveh S. Shahi, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ENE Evaluator
Represented By: Michael J. Marks, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?