Leavitt et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jacinta Leavitt and Paul Leavitt
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 2:2020cv00176
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Steven D. Davis filed by Jacinta Leavitt, Paul Leavitt. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steven D. Davis, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by D. Michael Noonan, Esq on behalf of Jacinta Leavitt, Paul Leavitt.(Noonan, D.)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathleen M. Guilfoyle, Esq on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson.(Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James M. Campbell, Esq on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson.(Campbell, James)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:14-cv-01655.
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2649) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) - Defs' Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7346) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Tim Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8755) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8822) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/30/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2205) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 3 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2206) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2297) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2724) - Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Steven MacLean, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2825) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2826) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2942) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (3053) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8731) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8832) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/30/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1986) - Pls' Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1988) - Pls' Amended Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2143) - Defs Resp to Pls' Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2661) Memorandum opinion and Order re Thomas Wright, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3844) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8760) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8840) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/30/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2425) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Peter Rosenblatt, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2428) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peter Rosenblatt, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2535) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Peter Rosenblatt, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2625) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peter Rosenblatt, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3553) - Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Peter Rosenblatt, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8739) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peter Rosenblatt, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8893) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Peter Rosenblatt)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/30/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2044) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Nicolette Horbach, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2044) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Nicolette Horbach, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2045) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Nicolette Horbach, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2183) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Nicolette Horbach, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2235) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Nicolette Horbach, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2714) Memorandum Opinion and Order re Nicolette Horbach, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2907) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Nicolette Horbach, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8719) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Nicolette Horbach, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8830) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Nicolette Horbach)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/30/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (4877) Part 1- Pls' Mot to Exclude Lawrence Lind, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (4877) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Lawrence Lind, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (4877) Part 3 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Lawrence Lind, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (4878) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Lawrence Lind, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (4945) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Lawrence Lind, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8559) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Lawrence Lind, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8560) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Lawrence Lind, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8654) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Lawrence Lind, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8728) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Lawrence Lind, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8881) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Lawrence Lind)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/30/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2075) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2078) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2172) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2214) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2664) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Peggy Pence, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2759) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2760) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2949) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3017) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8807) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8855) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/30/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1996) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1997) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2167) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2222) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2683) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Donald R. Ostergard, M.D., #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2814) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2816) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2950) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3011) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8769) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8851) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/30/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2710) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 7 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 8 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 9 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 10 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 11 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8805) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8829) - Defs' Supp Exhibit to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (8865) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/30/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2066) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2070) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 1- Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 5 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 6 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 7 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 8 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 9 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 10 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 11 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 12 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 13 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 14 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 15 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (2251) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/30/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1977) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1977) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1977) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1981) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2100) - Defs' Mot to Substitute Amended Exhibit A to Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2164) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2210) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2698) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Guelcher, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (4574) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (4675) Part 1 - Pls' resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (4675) Part 2 - Pls' resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (4692) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8790) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (8839) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/30/2020 to add party filers)(msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2049) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2241) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2668) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2931) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (5333) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (5482) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8776) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (8858) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/30/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) - First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) - Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) - Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) - Amended Short Form Complaint)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/30/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 11/3/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 11/2/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/20/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER The #34 Motion to Strike Defendants' Non-Retained Experts in Violation of the Court's Pretrial Order # 337 is GRANTED in part to the extent plaintiffs seek an order striking the experts identified by defendants in excess of five each and is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/19/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #38 Opposition by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #34 Motion by Jacinta Leavitt, Paul Leavitt to Strike Defendant's Non-Retained Experts in Violation of the Court's Pretrial Order #337. ERROR: Incorrect Exhibits C and D attached. CORRECTION: Exhibits C and D replaced. (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM by Jacinta Leavitt, Paul Leavitt in opposition to #30 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Opinions and Testimony of Donald Ostergard, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Davis, Steven) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 OPPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #34 MOTION by Jacinta Leavitt, Paul Leavitt to Strike Defendant's Non-Retained Experts in Violation of the Court's Pretrial Order #337 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Gage, William) (Modified on 11/20/2019 to replace exhibits C and D) (ts). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 OPPOSITION by Jacinta Leavitt, Paul Leavitt to #28 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Davis, Steven) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RESPONSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in opposition to #32 MOTION by Jacinta Leavitt, Paul Leavitt to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Lawrence Lind, M.D. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 702 (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Jacinta Leavitt, Paul Leavitt in support of #34 MOTION by Jacinta Leavitt, Paul Leavitt to Strike Defendant's Non-Retained Experts in Violation of the Court's Pretrial Order #337 (Davis, Steven) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION by Jacinta Leavitt, Paul Leavitt to Strike Defendant's Non-Retained Experts in Violation of the Court's Pretrial Order #337 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Davis, Steven) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Jacinta Leavitt, Paul Leavitt in support of #32 MOTION by Jacinta Leavitt, Paul Leavitt to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Lawrence Lind, M.D. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 702. (Davis, Steven) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION by Jacinta Leavitt, Paul Leavitt to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Lawrence Lind, M.D. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 702. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Davis, Steven) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
November 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #30 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Opinions and Testimony of Donald Ostergard, M.D. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
November 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Opinions and Testimony of Donald Ostergard, M.D. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A - D)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 11/4/2019 to correct event)(slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #28 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Plaintiffs' #25 Amended Notice of Deposition of Lawrence R. Lind, MD, FACOG, FACS (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jacinta Leavitt, Paul Leavitt for Amended Case-Specific Expert Report. (Davis, Steven) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION by Jacinta Leavitt, Paul Leavitt of Lawrence R. Lind, MD, FACOG, FACS on October 22, 2019 at 12:00 p.m. Eastern (Davis, Steven) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Jacinta Leavitt, Paul Leavitt of Lawrence Lind, MD, FACOG, FACS on October 22, 2019 at 12:00pm (EDT) (Davis, Steven) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Donald Ostergard on 10/17/19 at 8:00 a.m. MT (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Friends and Family on dates and times to be determined (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Donald Ostergard on 10/17/19 at 8:00 a.m. MT (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA for Dr. Jane Lowell. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jacinta Leavitt, Paul Leavitt for Plaintiff's Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Davis, Steven) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Jane Lowell on 9/10/19 at 1:00 p.m. EDT (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Jacinta Leavitt and Paul Leavitt on 8/16/19 at 9:00 a.m. and 1:00 p.m. EDT (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff, Paul Leavitt. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Jacinta Leavitt, Paul Leavitt. (Davis, Steven) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRETRIAL ORDER # 337 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 12 Cases) The court ORDERS that the cases on Exhibit A are: (1) removed from the pending inactive docket; and (2) placed on the active docket. The court further ORDERS that: (1) The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; (2) To the extent other defendants, in addition to Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, are named in the cases on Exhibit A, the deadlines below also apply to them; (3) The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and every case listed on Exhibit A become subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order; and (4) The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 12 cases with one important exception, as more fully set forth herein. Scheduling Deadlines. The following deadlines shall apply in all Ethicon Wave 12 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 05/11/2019. Defendant Fact Sheets due by 05/20/2019. Deadline for written discovery requests due by 06/20/2019. Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due by 08/19/2019. Expert disclosure served by defendants due by 09/18/2019. Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due by 09/25/2019. Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/25/2019. Filing of dispositive motions due by 11/01/2019. Response to dispositive motions due by 11/15/2019. Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 11/22/2019. Filing of Daubert motions due by 11/04/2019. Responses to Daubert motions due by 11/18/2019. Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/25/2019. Confidential Documents. Issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 9/20/2019, and any response is due by 10/3/2019. Any reply is due by 10/10/2019. Venue Recommendations. The parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases no later than 10/08/2019, the parties are ORDERED to file joint venue recommendations by 10/18/2019. The parties' joint recommendation(s) shall identify cases where venue is in dispute. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/1/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 12 cases identified on Exhibit A) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (klc) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (klc) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive") (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Ethicon, Inc. have reached a settlement with regard to Ethicon. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket. Plaintiff(s) and Ethicon may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 8/31/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 5247 in MDL Case No. 2327 Ethicon. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/12/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (brn) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Jacinta Leavitt, Paul Leavitt. (Plattenberger, Jacob) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Maxwell S. Kennerly updating his contact information on behalf of Jacinta Leavitt, Paul Leavitt. (Kennerly, Maxwell) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 95 (AGREED ORDER RE: DISMISSAL OF ADDITIONAL COOK ENTITIES IN ALL CASES) entered on 01/17/2014 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (cbo) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2901460. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ham) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/3/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leavitt et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson, Esq.
Represented By: William M. Gage, Esq.
Represented By: James M. Campbell, Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Guilfoyle, Esq.
Represented By: David B. Thomas, Esq.
Represented By: Christy D. Jones, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson, Esq.
Represented By: William M. Gage, Esq.
Represented By: James M. Campbell, Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Guilfoyle, Esq.
Represented By: David B. Thomas, Esq.
Represented By: Christy D. Jones, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacinta Leavitt
Represented By: Steven D. Davis
Represented By: Maxwell S. Kennerly
Represented By: D. Michael Noonan, Esq.
Represented By: Steven D. Davis, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Leavitt
Represented By: Steven D. Davis
Represented By: Maxwell S. Kennerly
Represented By: D. Michael Noonan, Esq.
Represented By: Steven D. Davis, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?