Cote et al v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Allison Dawn Cote and Kristy Lee Cote
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00186
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 21 JUDGMENT - Complaint is withdrawn. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Litigants (appeal period expires 1/22/2021))(kp)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #19 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Complaint. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 12/22/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
December 22, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Withdraw #12 Complaint filed by Allison Dawn Cote, Kristy Lee Cote. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(kp)
December 11, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by USAA Casualty Insurance Company of Filing #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Service) (originally filed 11/13/2020 in state court)(law)
December 11, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Allison Dawn Cote, Kristy Lee Cote. USAA Casualty Insurance Company served on 11/2/2020. (originally filed 11/5/2020 in state court)(law)
December 11, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. USAA Casualty Insurance Company served on 10/22/2020. (originally filed 11/5/2020 in state court)(law)
December 11, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against USAA Casualty Insurance Company filed by Allison Dawn Cote, Kristy Lee Cote. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (originally filed 11/4/2020 in state court)(law)
December 11, 2020 Filing 14 CORRECTED PROPOSED Summons filed by Allison Dawn Cote, Kristy Lee Cote. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance Form, #2 Letter) (originally filed 10/22/2020 in state court)(law)
December 11, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Assigned Docket Number. (originally filed 10/22/2020 in state court) (law)
December 11, 2020 Filing 12 COMPLAINT against USAA Casualty Insurance Company filed by Allison Dawn Cote, Kristy Lee Cote. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Trial by Jury, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Notice of Appearance, #4 Receipt) (originally filed 10/19/2020 in state court)(law)
December 11, 2020 Filing 11 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (law)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #7 Unopposed Motion to Stay All Proceedings. This case is stayed until January 4, 2021 at which time the reasons for the stay will be revisited. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 12/1/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
November 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Case Reassignment pursuant to Local Rule 73(d). Case reassigned to Judge Christina Reiss. Judge John M. Conroy no longer assigned to the case. (law)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 OBJECTION to Direct Assignment by Allison Dawn Cote, Kristy Lee Cote. (law)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings, MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Allison Dawn Cote, Kristy Lee Cote. (eh)
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. USAA Casualty Insurance Company served on 10/27/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (eh)
November 20, 2020 Filing 5 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 12/7/2020. (eh)
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MacIlwaine, Wm.)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Caledonia Unit, Civil Division seeking file or docket sheet. (law)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (law)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by USAA Casualty Insurance Company from Vermont Superior Court, Caladonia Unit, Civil Division, case number 131-10-20 Cacv. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Notice of Appearance, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)
November 12, 2020 ISSUED Local Rule 73 Forms.(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cote et al v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Wm. Andrew MacIlwaine, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Dawn Cote
Represented By: James R. A. Martin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Lee Cote
Represented By: James R. A. Martin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?