Morway v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Ashley Morway
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv00195
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Ashley Morway (Rubenstein, Phyllis) Text Clarified on 1/5/2021 (eh).
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: On or before 2/1/2021, Plaintiff shall return executed her Magistrate Judge Assignment Form. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 1/5/2021. (eh)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Commissioner of Social Security (Pere, Luis)
December 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Luis Pere, SAUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security.(Pere, Luis)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying as moot #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 12/8/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (eh)
December 8, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Ashley Morway. Summonses issued. LR 73 Forms issued. (eh)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Amended Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 12/8/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (eh)
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Ashley Morway. (eh)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, the Court takes notice that Plaintiff has failed to respond to Question 5 in the Application (Doc. 1-1) regarding the value of any assets owned by Plaintiff or the value of any property held for her behalf. It is therefore ORDERED that on or before 12/18/2020 Plaintiff shall file an Amended Application which must include a completed response to Question 5. (This is a text-only Order.) Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 11/24/2020. (eh)
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Ashley Morway. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #2 Proposed Complaint (document is sealed), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morway v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Luis Pere, SAUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Morway
Represented By: Phyllis E. Rubenstein, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?