Bankers Standard Insurance Company v. Steven M. Brown Construction Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bankers Standard Insurance Company
Defendant: Steven M. Brown Construction Co., Inc., Friends of the Sun, Ltd. and Dayco, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: ENE Evaluator
Case Number: 2:2020cv00223
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2021 Filing 29 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Bankers Standard Insurance Company (Harrington, Daniel)
May 18, 2021 Filing 28 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Answer to Interrogatories and Requests to Produce by Dayco, Inc..(Windish, Richard)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE/ORDER - Discovery due by 10/10/2021. Motions due by 10/31/2021. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/17/2021 at 10:00 AM. Ready for Trial by 11/30/2021. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 5/17/2021. (kp)
May 14, 2021 Filing 26 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Initial Disclosures by Dayco, Inc..(Windish, Richard)
May 14, 2021 Filing 25 PROPOSED Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order by Bankers Standard Insurance Company.(Harrington, Daniel)
May 12, 2021 Filing 24 LETTER SENT to counsel re: #21 proposed Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order non-compliance with Local Rule 26(a)(4). (law)
April 21, 2021 Filing 23 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: First Set of Interrogatories and Requests to Produce to Plaintiff by Dayco, Inc.(Windish, Richard)
April 14, 2021 Filing 22 ASSIGNED Early Neutral Evaluator: Michael J. Marks, Esq. (eh)
April 12, 2021 Filing 21 PROPOSED Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order by Bankers Standard Insurance Company.(Harrington, Daniel)
April 7, 2021 Filing 20 STIPULATED DISCOVERY LETTER SENT re: no stipulated discovery schedule filed; case will be set for a scheduling conference unless stipulated schedule is filed. (jbr)
March 8, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Q. Harrington, Esq on behalf of Bankers Standard Insurance Company.(Harrington, Daniel)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Q. Harrington, Esq. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 2/19/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
February 17, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Q. Harrington filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Daniel Q. Harrington, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Affidavit of Carey C. Rose)(law)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 Agreed-to Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 2/16/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
February 15, 2021 Filing 15 AGREED-TO MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Pietro J. Lynn, Esq. filed by Friends of the Sun, Ltd..(Wright, Kristin)
February 10, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Dayco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Windish, Richard)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Strike Answer. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 2/1/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
February 1, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike #9 Answer filed by Friends of the Sun, Ltd..(Wright, Kristin) Link added on 2/1/2021 (jlh).
January 28, 2021 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE Executed on 01-28-21 as to Dayco, Inc. of #5 Amended Complaint Acceptance of Service of Amended Complaint filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company(Rose, Carey)
January 28, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Bankers Standard Insurance Company served on 1/4/2021, answer due 1/25/2021.(Rose, Carey)
January 27, 2021 Filing 9 ***STRICKEN pursuant to 13 Order on 02/01/2021***ANSWER to Complaint by Friends of the Sun, Ltd..(Lynn, Pietro) (Main Document 9 replaced on 2/2/2021) (jlh)
January 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Pietro J. Lynn, Esq on behalf of Friends of the Sun, Ltd..(Lynn, Pietro)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Dayco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Windish, Richard)
January 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard J. Windish, Esq on behalf of Dayco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Windish, Richard)
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dayco, Inc. filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company.(jbr)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion of Christopher H. Boyle, Esq. for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 12/30/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
December 28, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher H. Boyle filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Carey C. Rose, Esq., #2 Affidavit of Christopher H. Boyle, Esq., #3 Exhibit A)(law)
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Bankers Standard Insurance Company. (law)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dayco, Inc., Friends of the Sun, Ltd., Steven M. Brown Construction Co., Inc. filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company. Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bankers Standard Insurance Company v. Steven M. Brown Construction Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven M. Brown Construction Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friends of the Sun, Ltd.
Represented By: Kristin C. Wright, Esq.
Represented By: Pietro J. Lynn, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayco, Inc.
Represented By: Richard J. Windish, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bankers Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher H. Boyle, Esq.
Represented By: Carey C. Rose, Esq.
Represented By: Daniel Q. Harrington, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ENE Evaluator
Represented By: Michael J. Marks, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?