Rodney et al v. Casella Waste Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph Wilson Rodney, Jr., Rosemarie Sibley and Kenneth Messom
Defendant: Casella Waste Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00196
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Kevin J Doyle
Referring Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Consents to Join by Joseph Wilson Rodney, Jr, Rosemarie Sibley (Attachments: #1 Consent of James J. Felle, #2 Consent of Daniel Taylor)(Alexander, William)
October 12, 2021 Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Casella Waste Systems, Inc. filed by Joseph Wilson Rodney, Jr, Rosemarie Sibley, Kenneth Messom.(jbr) Filer added on 10/13/2021 (law).
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Austin W. Anderson, Esq. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 10/1/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
October 1, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Austin W. Anderson filed by Joseph Wilson Rodney, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Auston Anderson, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William Clifton Alexander, Esq. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 9/30/2021. (ejh)
September 28, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William Clifton "Clif" Alexander filed by Joseph Wilson Rodney, Jr, Rosemarie Sibley. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Clif Alexander, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
September 20, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne B. Rosenblum, Esq on behalf of Casella Waste Systems, Inc..(Rosenblum, Anne)
September 20, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin B. Barnard, Esq on behalf of Casella Waste Systems, Inc..(Barnard, Justin)
September 20, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and lack of supplemental jurisdiction over the state-law counts filed by Casella Waste Systems, Inc..(Berger, Ritchie)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Casella Waste Systems, Inc. (Berger, Ritchie)
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ritchie E. Berger, Esq on behalf of Casella Waste Systems, Inc..(Berger, Ritchie)
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Joseph Wilson Rodney, Jr, Rosemarie Sibley. Casella Waste Systems, Inc. served on 8/31/2021, answer due 9/21/2021(Larson, Tristan)
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Reassignment pursuant to Local Rule 73(d). Case reassigned to Judge Christina Reiss. Judge Kevin J. Doyle no longer assigned to the case. (law)
August 26, 2021 Filing 5 OBJECTION to Direct Assignment by Joseph Wilson Rodney, Jr, Rosemarie Sibley (Larson, Tristan)
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join by Joseph Wilson Rodney, Jr, Rosemarie Sibley re #2 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Consent to Join Wage Claim of Richard Nicholson)(Larson, Tristan) Text clarified on 8/27/2021 (law).
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING CONSENTS TO JOIN by Joseph Wilson Rodney, Jr, Rosemarie Sibley re #2 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Consent to Join Wage Claim - Avery, Scott, #2 Consent to Join Wage Claim - Bennett, Philip, #3 Consent to Join Wage Claim - Gagnon, Jr., David James, #4 Consent to Join Wage Claim - Gilman, Darrin, #5 Consent to Join Wage Claim - Gilman, Patrick, #6 Consent to Join Wage Claim - Gonzales, Michel E., #7 Consent to Join Wage Claim - Hogan, John, #8 Consent to Join Wage Claim - Messom, Kenneth, #9 Consent to Join Wage Claim - Philibotte, Dale, #10 Consent to Join Wage Claim - Soto, Anthony, #11 Consent to Join Wage Claim - Stacey, Joseph, #12 Consent to Join Wage Claim - Talbot, Jared J., #13 Consent to Join Wage Claim - Thibodeau, Joseph C., #14 Consent to Join Wage Claim - Vielguth, Brian, #15 Consent to Join Wage Claim - Webb, Kenneth, #16 Consent to Join Wage Claim - Webster, James, #17 Consent to Join Wage Claim - Welsher, Michael, #18 Consent to Join Wage Claim - Zimmerman, IV, Charles) (Larson, Tristan) Attachment names clarified on 8/23/2021. (hbc).
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (Revised) against Casella Waste Systems, Inc. filed by Joseph Wilson Rodney, Jr, Rosemarie Sibley. Summons and LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (hbc)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Casella Waste Systems, Inc. filed by Joseph Wilson Rodney, Jr., Rosemarie Sibley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (hbc) Text clarified on 8/18/2021. (hbc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodney et al v. Casella Waste Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Wilson Rodney, Jr.
Represented By: Tristan C. Larson, Esq.
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson, Esq.
Represented By: William C. Alexander, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemarie Sibley
Represented By: Tristan C. Larson, Esq.
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson, Esq.
Represented By: William C. Alexander, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Messom
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson, Esq.
Represented By: Tristan C. Larson, Esq.
Represented By: William C. Alexander, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casella Waste Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Anne B. Rosenblum, Esq.
Represented By: Justin B. Barnard, Esq.
Represented By: Ritchie E. Berger, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?