State of Vermont v. Exxon Mobil Corporation et al
Plaintiff: State of Vermont
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Royal Dutch Shell plc, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Motiva Enterprises LLC, Sunoco LP, Sunoco LLC, ETC Sunoco Holdings LLC, Energy Transfer (R&M) LLC, Energy Transfer LP and Citgo Petroleum Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv00260
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric L. Lewis; granting #46 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark J. Leimkuhler. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 12/20/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM in Support re: #36 MOTION to Remand filed by State of Vermont (Kolber, Justin)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #45 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric L. Lewis, Esq. and #46 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark J. Leimkuhler, Esq. The required Certificates of Good Standing were omitted at the time of filing. They are now attached to #45 and #46 , respectively, as well as this entry. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (law)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of Vermont re: #45 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric L. Lewis, Esq. and #46 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark J. Leimkuhler, Esq.(Kolber, Justin) Links added on 12/17/2021 (law).
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark J. Leimkuhler, Esq. filed by State of Vermont. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2021: #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (law).
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric L. Lewis, Esq. filed by State of Vermont. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2021: #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (law).
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lisa S. Meyer; granting #41 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Pamela R. Hanebutt; granting #42 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nathan P. Eimer; granting #43 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert E. Dunn. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 12/10/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert E. Dunn, Esq. filed by CITGO Petroleum Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(jlh)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nathan P. Eimer, Esq. filed by CITGO Petroleum Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(jlh)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Pamela R. Hanebutt, Esq. filed by CITGO Petroleum Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(jlh)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lisa S. Meyer, Esq. filed by CITGO Petroleum Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(jlh)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tracie J. Renfroe and Oliver Thoma. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 12/3/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tracie J. Renfroe, Esq. and Oliver Thoma, Esq. filed by Motiva Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Certificate of Service)(jlh)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPLY to Response to #19 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Royal Dutch Shell plc. (Byrne, Matthew)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Remand filed by State of Vermont.(Kolber, Justin)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Meghan H. Berge. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 11/19/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Megan H. Berge, Esq. filed by ETC Sunoco Holdings LLC, Energy Transfer (R&M) LLC, Energy Transfer LP, Sunoco LLC, Sunoco LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(jlh)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sterling Marchand; granting #32 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Scott Janoe. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 11/18/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Scott Janoe, Esq. filed by ETC Sunoco Holdings LLC, Energy Transfer (R&M) LLC, Energy Transfer LP, Sunoco LLC, Sunoco LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(jlh)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sterling Marchand, Esq. filed by Energy Transfer (R&M) LLC, Energy Transfer LP, Sunoco LLC, Sunoco LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(jlh)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by State of Vermont. (Kolber, Justin)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Patrick J. Conlon. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 11/8/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Patrick J. Conlon, Esq. filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Patrick J. Conlon, Esq., #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Service)(jlh)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Consent by Motiva Enterprises LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Byrne, Matthew)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Motiva Enterprises LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Byrne, Matthew)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Admission of Daniel J. Toal Pro Hac Vice; granting #23 Motion for Admission of Justin Anderson Pro Hac Vice; granting #24 Motion for Admission of Theodore V. Wells, Jr. Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 11/3/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Theodore V. Wells, Jr. filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Theodore V. Wells, Jr., #2 Certificates of Good Standing)(jlh)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Justin Anderson, Esq. filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Justin Anderson, Esq., #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by ETC Sunoco Holdings LLC, Energy Transfer (R&M) LLC, Energy Transfer LP, Sunoco LLC, Sunoco LP (Doherty, Jr., Timothy)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel J. Toal, Esq. filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Daniel J. Toal, Esq., #2 Certificates of Good Standing)(jlh)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: #24 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Theodore V. Wells Jr., Esq., #23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Justin Anderson, Esq., #21 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel J. Toal, Esq. by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation.(Berger, Ritchie) Text clarified, links and filer added on 11/3/2021 (law).
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Royal Dutch Shell plc, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Byrne, Matthew)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Citgo Petroleum Corporation (Lynn, Pietro)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Stay Deadlines and for a Coordinated Briefing Schedule. Motion to Remand due by 11/22/2021; opening memorandum of law in support of Motion to Remand due by 12/17/2021; consolidated memorandum in opposition due by 2/18/2022; reply memorandum due by 3/18/2022. The deadline for responding to the complaint, initial disclosures, discovery schedule and ENE are stayed until further order of the court. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/27/2021. (law)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by ETC Sunoco Holdings LLC, Energy Transfer (R&M) LLC, Energy Transfer LP, Sunoco LLC, Sunoco LP re #1 Notice of Removal. (Doherty, Jr., Timothy) Link added on 10/28/2021 (law).
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Consent by Royal Dutch Shell plc, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (Byrne, Matthew)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin E. Kolber, Esq on behalf of State of Vermont.(Kolber, Justin)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura B. Murphy, Esq on behalf of State of Vermont.(Murphy, Laura)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Walter E. Judge, Jr., Esq on behalf of ETC Sunoco Holdings LLC, Energy Transfer (R&M) LLC, Energy Transfer LP, Sunoco LLC, Sunoco LP.(Judge, Jr., Walter)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy C. Doherty, Jr., Esq on behalf of ETC Sunoco Holdings LLC, Energy Transfer (R&M) LLC, Energy Transfer LP, Sunoco LLC, Sunoco LP.(Doherty, Jr., Timothy)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David C. Frederick, James M. Webster, III, Daniel S. Severson, and Grace W. Knofczynski. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/25/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Stay Deadlines and for a Coordinated Briefing Schedule by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation (Berger, Ritchie)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Consent to #1 Notice of Removal by Citgo Petroleum Corporation. (Lynn, Pietro) Link added on 10/25/2021 (law).
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Chittenden Unit, Civil Division requesting file and certified docket sheet. (law)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David C. Frederick, James M. Webster, III, Daniel S. Severson, and Grace W. Knofczynski filed by Royal Dutch Shell plc, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(jlh)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(law)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew B. Byrne, Esq on behalf of Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(law)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (law)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ritchie E. Berger, Esq on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation.(law)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation from Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Chittenden Unit, case number unknown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service) (exhibits too voluminous to scan, on file in clerk's office) (law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Vermont v. Exxon Mobil Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Vermont
Represented By: Joshua R. Diamond, Esq.
Represented By: Justin E. Kolber, Esq.
Represented By: Laura B. Murphy, Esq.
Represented By: Thomas J. Donovan, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Eric L. Lewis, Esq.
Represented By: Mark J. Leimkuhler, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Ritchie E. Berger, Esq.
Represented By: Daniel J. Toal, Esq.
Represented By: Justin Anderson, Esq.
Represented By: Patrick J. Conlon, Esq.
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr., Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
Represented By: Ritchie E. Berger, Esq.
Represented By: Daniel J. Toal, Esq.
Represented By: Justin Anderson, Esq.
Represented By: Patrick J. Conlon, Esq.
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr., Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Dutch Shell plc
Represented By: Daniel Severson, Esq.
Represented By: David C. Frederick, Esq.
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski, Esq.
Represented By: James M. Webster, III, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew B. Byrne, Esq.
Represented By: Daniel S. Severson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Daniel Severson, Esq.
Represented By: David C. Frederick, Esq.
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski, Esq.
Represented By: James M. Webster, III, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew B. Byrne, Esq.
Represented By: Daniel S. Severson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Products Company LLC
Represented By: Daniel Severson, Esq.
Represented By: David C. Frederick, Esq.
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski, Esq.
Represented By: James M. Webster, III, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew B. Byrne, Esq.
Represented By: Daniel S. Severson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motiva Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Matthew B. Byrne, Esq.
Represented By: Oliver P. Thoma, Esq.
Represented By: Tracie J. Renfroe, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunoco LP
Represented By: Timothy C. Doherty, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Walter E. Judge, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: J. Scott Janoe, Esq.
Represented By: Megan H. Berge, Esq.
Represented By: Sterling A. Marchand, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunoco LLC
Represented By: Timothy C. Doherty, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Walter E. Judge, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: J. Scott Janoe, Esq.
Represented By: Megan H. Berge, Esq.
Represented By: Sterling A. Marchand, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETC Sunoco Holdings LLC
Represented By: Timothy C. Doherty, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Walter E. Judge, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: J. Scott Janoe, Esq.
Represented By: Megan H. Berge, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy Transfer (R&M) LLC
Represented By: Timothy C. Doherty, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Walter E. Judge, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: J. Scott Janoe, Esq.
Represented By: Megan H. Berge, Esq.
Represented By: Sterling A. Marchand, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy Transfer LP
Represented By: Timothy C. Doherty, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Walter E. Judge, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: J. Scott Janoe, Esq.
Represented By: Megan H. Berge, Esq.
Represented By: Sterling A. Marchand, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citgo Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Pietro J. Lynn, Esq.
Represented By: Lisa S. Meyer, Esq.
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer, Esq.
Represented By: Pamela R. Hanebutt, Esq.
Represented By: Robert E. Dunn, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?