Farris v. The Orvis Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brian Farris, Lance Groff and Tom Theus
Defendant: The Orvis Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00007
Filed: January 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER Withdrawing Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs and Stipulation for Dismissal. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 2/9/2023. (sjl)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION Withdrawing Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs and Stipulation for Dismissal re #27 MOTION for Attorney Fees by The Orvis Company, Inc. (Soule, Stephen) Modified on 2/9/2023 to clarify text (sjl).
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: re #27 Motion for Attorney Fees. The opposition to the Motion for Attorney Fees is due February 24, 2023, in light of the withdrawal of the appeal. (This is a text-only Order.). Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 2/2/2023. (ejh)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MANDATE of USCA Case No 22-3075 as to #30 Notice of Appeal. Stipulation withdrawing #30 appeal pursuant to FRAP 42 is "So Ordered". (gmg)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re #32 Stipulation Regarding #27 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 12/8/2022. (sjl)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 USCA Appeal Filing Fee received. PAID $505.00 receipt number 38 re #30 Notice of Appeal filed by Lance Groff, Brian Farris, Tom Theus. (gmg)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TRANSMITTED Index on Appeal Circuit No. 22-3075 re: #30 Notice of Appeal. (gmg)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION Regarding #27 Motion for Attorney Fees by Brian Farris, Lance Groff, Tom Theus (Morris, Aaron) Modified on 12/7/2022 to clarify text and link entries (sjl).
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING #29 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew D. Pearson, Esq. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 12/5/2022. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
December 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #26 Judgment Dismissing Complaint by Brian Farris, Lance Groff, Tom Theus (Morris, Aaron)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ASSENTED-TO MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew D. Pearson, Esq. filed by The Orvis Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 BILL OF COSTS by The Orvis Company, Inc. (Soule, Stephen)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by The Orvis Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4) (Soule, Stephen) Modified on 11/23/2022 to clarify attachment (sjl).
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JUDGMENT - Plaintiff's Complaint is Dismissed. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Litigants (appeal period expires 12/09/2022)) (sjl)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE Regarding Amendment of Complaint by Brian Farris, Lance Groff, Tom Theus. (Morris, Aaron)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OPINION and ORDER granting Defendant's #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and granting Plaintiff's Leave to Amend their Complaint within twenty (20) days of this Order. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 10/18/2022. (jbr)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #22 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss #2 Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by The Orvis Company, Inc. The attached Exhibit A has been replaced to remove illegible PDF headers. The corrected document is attached to #22 and this entry. (sjl)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss #2 Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by The Orvis Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Modified on 9/1/2022 to clarify attachment, link entries, and correct Exhibit PDF to remove illegible headers (sjl).
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable re: 19 Order Granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Arun Ravindran, Esq. Mail sent to Arun Ravindran, Esq. (Attachments: #1 Document 19) (sjl)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Christina Reiss: Motion Hearing held on 7/11/2022 re #6 MOTION to Dismiss #2 Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. Present via video conference: Arun Ravindran, Esq., and Aaron Morris, Esq., for pltf. Casie Collignan, Esq., Stephen Soule, Esq., and Robin Feldstein, Esq., for dft. Court makes inquiries. Statements by counsel. ORDERED: motion #6 to Dismiss taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: JoAnn Carson) (jbr)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Arun Ravindran, Esq. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 7/11/2022. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Arun Ravindran, Esq. filed by Brian Farris, Lance Groff, Tom Theus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(jlh)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Casie D. Collignon, Esq on behalf of The Orvis Company, Inc..(Collignon, Casie)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robyn M. Feldstein, Esq on behalf of The Orvis Company, Inc..(Feldstein, Robyn)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #14 Reply to Response to #6 MOTION to Dismiss #2 Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by The Orvis Company, Inc. The incorrect document was uploaded at the time of filing. The correct document is now attached to #14 as well as this entry. (jlh)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY to Response to #6 MOTION to Dismiss #2 Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by The Orvis Company, Inc. (Soule, Stephen) Modified on 6/27/2022 to clarify text (sjl). (Main Document 14 replaced on 6/28/2022) (jlh).
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss #2 Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2022 at 11:00 AM, via video conference, in Burlington Courtroom 110 before Judge Christina Reiss.(jbr)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss #2 Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Brian Farris, Lance Groff, Tom Theus. (Morris, Aaron)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Casie D. Collignon, Esq. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 4/14/2022. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robyn M. Feldstein, Esq. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 4/14/2022. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Casie D. Collignon Esq. filed by The Orvis Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robyn M. Feldstein Esq. filed by The Orvis Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by The Orvis Company, Inc. (Soule, Stephen)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss #2 Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by The Orvis Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Soule, Stephen)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen J. Soule, Esq on behalf of The Orvis Company, Inc..(Soule, Stephen)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER re: #3 Stipulation for Updated Scheduling Deadlines. Motion to Dismiss due 4/11/22; Response due 5/26/22; Reply due 6/27/22. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 3/14/2022. (sjl) Modified on 3/15/2022 to correct docket text (sjl).
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATION and Proposed Consent Order for Updated Scheduling Deadlines by Brian Farris, Lance Groff, Tom Theus (Morris, Aaron) Modified on 3/10/2022 to correct docket entry title (sjl).
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Orvis Company, Inc. filed by Brian Farris, Lance Groff, Tom Theus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(kp) Date filed clarified on 2/28/2022 (jlh).
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Orvis Company, Inc. filed by Brian Farris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farris v. The Orvis Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Farris
Represented By: Aaron T. Morris, Esq.
Represented By: Arun Ravindran, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Groff
Represented By: Aaron T. Morris, Esq.
Represented By: Arun Ravindran, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Theus
Represented By: Aaron T. Morris, Esq.
Represented By: Arun Ravindran, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Orvis Company, Inc.
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon, Esq.
Represented By: Robyn M. Feldstein, Esq.
Represented By: Stephen J. Soule, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?