Baird v. Deml et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Baird
Defendant: Nicholas Deml and State of Vermont
Case Number: 2:2022cv00165
Filed: August 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2022 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to #34 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Cynthia Baird. (Turner, Rebecca)
October 14, 2022 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Nicholas Deml, State of Vermont. (Gaudet, Patrick)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING #37 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 10/11/2022. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING #36 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 Motion to Dismiss #6 Complaint. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 10/11/2022. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
October 7, 2022 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cynthia Baird.(Turner, Rebecca)
October 7, 2022 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Complaint filed by Cynthia Baird.(Turner, Rebecca) Event/text clarified, link added on 10/7/2022 (law).
October 3, 2022 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition to #25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nicholas Deml, State of Vermont. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Disputed Material Facts, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts)(Gaudet, Patrick)
September 30, 2022 Filing 34 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Cynthia Baird.(Turner, Rebecca)
September 30, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca N. Turner on behalf of Cynthia Baird.(Turner, Rebecca)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING #31 Consented-to Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #25 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 9/19/2022. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
September 16, 2022 Filing 31 CONSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nicholas Deml, State of Vermont.(Gaudet, Patrick)
September 9, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Filing #1 Notice of Removal by Nicholas Deml, State of Vermont. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal) (originally filed 09/09/2022 in state court) (sjl)
September 9, 2022 Filing 29 ENTRY REGARDING MOTION denying as moot #12 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert A. Mello, Superior Judge. (originally filed 08/18/2022 in state court) (sjl)
September 9, 2022 Filing 28 ENTRY REGARDING MOTION granting #27 MOTION to Amend #6 Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert A. Mello, Superior Judge. (originally filed 08/18/2022 in state court) (sjl)
September 9, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION to Amend #6 Complaint filed by Cynthia Baird. (originally filed 8/17/2022 in state court) (sjl)
September 9, 2022 Filing 26 ENTRY REGARDING MOTION re #12 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert A. Mello, Superior Judge. (originally filed 06/13/2022) (sjl)
September 9, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cynthia Baird. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14) (originally filed 08/17/2022 in state court) (sjl)
September 9, 2022 Filing 24 Proposed Amended Complaint filed by Cynthia Baird. (originally filed 8/17/2022 in state court) (sjl) Modified on 9/9/2022 to correct entry (sjl).
September 9, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Hearing re #12 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Instructions for Participating in a Hearing or Case Manager Conference) (originally filed 06/13/2022 in state court) (sjl)
September 9, 2022 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to #12 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Complaint filed by Nicholas Deml, State of Vermont. (originally filed 6/10/2022 in state court) (sjl)
September 9, 2022 Filing 21 ENTRY REGARDING MOTION granting #20 CONSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert A. Mello, Superior Judge. (originally filed 05/26/2022 in state court) (sjl)
September 9, 2022 Filing 20 CONSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Complaint filed by James Baker, State of Vermont. (originally filed 05/17/2022 in state court) (sjl)
September 9, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by State of Vermont, James Baker. (originally filed 05/17/2022 in state court) (sjl)
September 9, 2022 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Complaint filed by Cynthia Baird. (originally filed 05/03/2022 in state court) (sjl)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENTRY ORDER REGARDING MOTION granting #16 MOTION for Extension of Time as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert A. Mello, Superior Judge. (originally filed 04/04/2022 in state court) (sjl)
September 9, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Complaint filed by Cynthia Baird. (originally filed 02/25/2022 in state court) (sjl)
September 9, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca N. Turner on behalf of Cynthia Baird. (originally filed 2/25/2022 in state court) (sjl)
September 9, 2022 Filing 14 ENTRY REGARDING MOTION granting #13 CONSENTED TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Complaint. Response deadline set for 3/1/2022. Signed by Judge Robert A. Mello, Superior Judge. (originally filed 01/03/2022 in state court) (sjl) Modified on 9/12/2022 to clarify text (sjl).
September 9, 2022 Filing 13 CONSENTED TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Complaint filed by Cynthia Baird. (originally filed 12/27/2021 in state court) (sjl) Modified on 9/12/2022 to clarify text (sjl).
September 9, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Complaint filed by James Baker, State of Vermont. (originally filed 12/06/2021 in state court) (sjl)
September 9, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: James Baker waiver sent on 11/4/2021. (originally filed 11/09/2021 in state court) (sjl)
September 9, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy P. Connors on behalf of State of Vermont. (originally filed 11/02/2021 in state court) (sjl)
September 9, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kelly Green, Esq. on behalf of Cynthia Baird. (originally filed 10/06/2021 in state court) (sjl)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judicial Officer: Clerk, Superior Court (originally filed 09/28/2021 in state court) (sjl)
September 9, 2022 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Cynthia Baird. (originally filed 09/24/2021 in state court) (sjl)
September 9, 2022 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against James Baker, State of Vermont filed by Cynthia Baird. (originally filed 09/24/2021 in state court) (sjl)
September 9, 2022 Filing 5 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (sjl)
September 7, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Nicholas Deml, State of Vermont.(Gaudet, Patrick)
September 1, 2022 Filing 3 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Washington County, Civil Division requesting original case file and certified docket sheet. (sjl)
September 1, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by State of Vermont, Nicholas Deml. Entry was clarified to correct filer names in docket text. (sjl)
August 31, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State of Vermont, Nicholas Deml from Vermont Superior Court, Washington Unit, Civil Division, case number 21-cv-02957. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet (sjl) Modified on 9/1/2022 to correct text (sjl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baird v. Deml et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Baird
Represented By: Kelly Green, Esq.
Represented By: Rebecca N. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Deml
Represented By: Patrick T. Gaudet, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Vermont
Represented By: Patrick T. Gaudet, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?