Marshall v. Lamoille Health Partners, Inc.
Plaintiff: Patricia Marshall
Defendant: Lamoille Health Partners, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00166
Filed: September 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPINION AND ORDER denying #14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 4/13/2023. (law)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY to Response to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lamoille Health Partners, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cleary, John)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Withdrawal re: Chirstopher H. Boyle by Lamoille Health Partners, Inc. (Lynn, Pietro)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Admission of Terence R. Coates and Justin C. Walker Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 3/8/2023. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Terence R. Coates, Esq. and Justin C. Walker, Esq. filed by Patricia Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(jlh)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Patricia Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Byrne, Matthew)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission of Shundra C. Manning Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 2/28/2023. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shundra C. Manning, Esq. filed by Lamoille Health Partners, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(jlh)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Lamoille Health Partners, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cleary, John) Event/text clarified on 2/3/2023 (law).
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John C. Cleary, Esq on behalf of Lamoille Health Partners, Inc..(Cleary, John)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John C. Cleary, Esq., Catherine A. Green, Esq., and Mark A. Olthoff Esq.; granting #11 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 12/29/2022. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Lamoille Health Partners, Inc..(Boyle, Christopher)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John C. Cleary, Esq., Catherine A. Green, Esq., and Mark A. Olthoff Esq. filed by Lamoille Health Partners, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(jlh)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Lamoille Health Partners, Inc. (Lynn, Pietro)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Second Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/26/2022. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Lamoille Health Partners, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lynn, Pietro) Text clarified on 10/26/2022 (law).
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/3/2022. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher H. Boyle, Esq on behalf of Lamoille Health Partners, Inc..(Boyle, Christopher)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Lamoille Health Partners, Inc.(Lynn, Pietro)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Pietro J. Lynn, Esq on behalf of Lamoille Health Partners, Inc..(Lynn, Pietro)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Lamoille Health Partners, Inc. served on 9/12/2022, answer due 10/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Byrne, Matthew)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Lamoille Health Partners, Inc. filed by Patricia Marshall. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. Lamoille Health Partners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Marshall
Represented By: Matthew B. Byrne, Esq.
Represented By: Justin C. Walker, Esq.
Represented By: Terence R. Coates, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamoille Health Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher H. Boyle, Esq.
Represented By: Pietro J. Lynn, Esq.
Represented By: Catherine A. Green, Esq.
Represented By: John C. Cleary, Esq.
Represented By: Mark A. Olthoff, Esq.
Represented By: Shundra C. Crumpton Manning, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?