Rubman et al v. Bayer AG et al
Plaintiff: Tracy L. Rubman, James Ellery Baker and Kathy A. Lothian
Defendant: Bayer AG, Monsanto Company, Bayer Cropscience L.P., Solutia, Inc., Pharmacia, L.L.C., Pharmacia, Inc. and Pharmacia Corp.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00181
Filed: October 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #20 MOTION to Dismiss (Counts IV, V, VII) filed by Pharmacia Corp., Solutia, Inc., Pharmacia, L.L.C., Monsanto Company, Pharmacia, Inc., Bayer AG, Bayer Cropscience L.P. The document has been replaced to clarify the title. Also, the certificate of service was omitted and not uploaded at the time of filing. The documents are now attached to #20 and this entry. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (law)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss (Counts IV, V, VII) filed by Bayer AG, Bayer Cropscience L.P., Monsanto Company, Pharmacia Corp., Pharmacia, Inc., Pharmacia, L.L.C., Solutia, Inc..(Carleton, Ian) (Main Document 20 replaced and Additional attachment(s) added on 12/2/2022: #1 Certificate of Service) (law).
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Solutia, Inc. (Carleton, Ian)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Monsanto Company (Carleton, Ian)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Pharmacia, L.L.C. (Carleton, Ian)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Bayer Cropscience L.P. (Carleton, Ian)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/28/2022. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Devin T. McKnight, Esq on behalf of Bayer Cropscience L.P., Monsanto Company, Pharmacia Corp., Pharmacia, Inc., Pharmacia, L.L.C., Solutia, Inc..(McKnight, Devin)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexandrea L. Nelson, Esq on behalf of Bayer Cropscience L.P., Monsanto Company, Pharmacia Corp., Pharmacia, Inc., Pharmacia, L.L.C., Solutia, Inc..(Nelson, Alexandrea)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Bayer Cropscience L.P., Monsanto Company, Pharmacia Corp., Pharmacia, Inc., Pharmacia, L.L.C., Solutia, Inc..(Carleton, Ian)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ian P. Carleton, Esq on behalf of Bayer Cropscience L.P., Monsanto Company, Pharmacia Corp., Pharmacia, Inc., Pharmacia, L.L.C., Solutia, Inc..(Carleton, Ian)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Kathy A. Lothian, Tracy L. Rubman, James Ellery Baker. Pharmacia Corp. served on 10/11/2022, answer due 11/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Leckerling, III, E.)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Kathy A. Lothian, Tracy L. Rubman, James Ellery Baker. Pharmacia, Inc. served on 10/11/2022, answer due 11/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Leckerling, III, E.)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Kathy A. Lothian, Tracy L. Rubman, James Ellery Baker. Pharmacia, L.L.C. served on 10/11/2022, answer due 11/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Leckerling, III, E.)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED filed by Kathy A. Lothian, Tracy L. Rubman, James Ellery Baker. Solutia, Inc. served on 10/10/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Leckerling, III, E.) Text clarified on 10/17/2022 (law).
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED filed by Kathy A. Lothian, Tracy L. Rubman, James Ellery Baker. Bayer Cropscience L.P. served on 10/11/2022, answer due 11/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Leckerling, III, E.) Text clarified on 10/17/2022 (law).
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED filed by Kathy A. Lothian, Tracy L. Rubman, James Ellery Baker. Monsanto Company served on 10/11/2022, answer due 11/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Leckerling, III, E.) Text clarified on 10/17/2022 (law).
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Admission of T. Roe Frazer II, Pro Hac Vice; granting #3 Motion for Admission of W. Wylie Blair, Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/6/2022. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of W. Wylie Blair, Esq. filed by Bayer AG, Kathy A. Lothian, Tracy L. Rubman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of T. Roe Frazer, II, Esq. filed by James Ellery Baker, Kathy A. Lothian, Tracy L. Rubman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bayer AG, Bayer Cropscience L.P., Monsanto Company, Pharmacia Corp., Pharmacia, Inc., Pharmacia, L.L.C., Solutia, Inc. filed by Kathy A. Lothian, Tracy L. Rubman, James Ellery Baker. Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rubman et al v. Bayer AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy L. Rubman
Represented By: E. William Leckerling, III, Esq.
Represented By: T. Roe Frazer, II, Esq.
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ellery Baker
Represented By: E. William Leckerling, III, Esq.
Represented By: T. Roe Frazer, II, Esq.
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy A. Lothian
Represented By: E. William Leckerling, III, Esq.
Represented By: T. Roe Frazer, II, Esq.
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer AG
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair, Esq.
Represented By: Ian P. Carleton, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Alexandrea L. Nelson, Esq.
Represented By: Devin T. McKnight, Esq.
Represented By: Ian P. Carleton, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Cropscience L.P.
Represented By: Alexandrea L. Nelson, Esq.
Represented By: Devin T. McKnight, Esq.
Represented By: Ian P. Carleton, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solutia, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandrea L. Nelson, Esq.
Represented By: Devin T. McKnight, Esq.
Represented By: Ian P. Carleton, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia, L.L.C.
Represented By: Alexandrea L. Nelson, Esq.
Represented By: Devin T. McKnight, Esq.
Represented By: Ian P. Carleton, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandrea L. Nelson, Esq.
Represented By: Devin T. McKnight, Esq.
Represented By: Ian P. Carleton, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corp.
Represented By: Alexandrea L. Nelson, Esq.
Represented By: Devin T. McKnight, Esq.
Represented By: Ian P. Carleton, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?