UCB, Inc. et al v. Mylan Technologies Inc.
Plaintiff: UCB, Inc., UCB Pharma GmbH and LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG
Defendant: Mylan Technologies Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00216
Filed: December 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard L. Rainey, Esq. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 1/9/2023. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
January 5, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard L. Rainey, Esq. filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Richard L. Rainey, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin B. Collins, Esq. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 1/5/2023. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
January 5, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin B. Collins, Esq. filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kevin B. Collins, Esq., #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of George F. Pappas, Esq. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 1/5/2023. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
January 5, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of George F. Pappas, Esq. filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of George F. Pappas, Esq., #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian Bieluch, Esq. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 12/27/2022. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
December 22, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed. Docket text has been clarified to read: Mylan Technologies Inc. waiver sent on 12/15/2022, answer due 2/13/2023. (jlh)
December 22, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian Bieluch, Esq. filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brian Bieluch, Esq., #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Service)(jlh)
December 22, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Mylan Technologies Inc. Waiver sent on 12/15/2022, answer due 2/13/2023. (Hoechst, Kendall) Text clarified on 12/22/2022 (jlh).
December 13, 2022 Filing 3 MAILED Form AO 120 to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (document is sealed) (law)
December 12, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc. (law)
December 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Mylan Technologies Inc. filed by UCB, Inc., UCB Pharma GmbH, LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UCB, Inc. et al v. Mylan Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UCB, Inc.
Represented By: Kendall A. Hoechst, Esq.
Represented By: Ritchie E. Berger, Esq.
Represented By: Kevin B. Collins, Esq.
Represented By: Richard L. Rainey, Esq.
Represented By: Brian Bieluch, Esq.
Represented By: George F. Pappas, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UCB Pharma GmbH
Represented By: Kendall A. Hoechst, Esq.
Represented By: Ritchie E. Berger, Esq.
Represented By: Brian Bieluch, Esq.
Represented By: George F. Pappas, Esq.
Represented By: Kevin B. Collins, Esq.
Represented By: Richard L. Rainey, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG
Represented By: Kendall A. Hoechst, Esq.
Represented By: Ritchie E. Berger, Esq.
Represented By: Brian Bieluch, Esq.
Represented By: George F. Pappas, Esq.
Represented By: Kevin B. Collins, Esq.
Represented By: Richard L. Rainey, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?