Taal v. Cronin et al
Plaintiff: Baboucar B. Taal
Defendant: John Cronin, Danette Labrecque, Nathan Labrecque, Valerie Raudonis, David Tencza, Jack S. White, Cronin, Bisson & Zalinsky, P.C., Welts, White & Fontaine P.C., Bill Weidacher, Kathleen Edwards, Keller Williams and Keller Williams Bedford NH-Realty
Case Number: 2:2022cv00217
Filed: December 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2023 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #13 PARTIALLY ASSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File #12 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction , for Failure to State a Claim, For Improper Venue, and For Failure to Plead With Particularity filed by Baboucar B. Taal. (Taal, Baboucar) Text clarified and Attachment 1 removed as duplication of main document on 2/9/2023 (law).
February 8, 2023 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction , for Failure to State a Claim, For Improper Venue, and For Failure to Plead With Particularity filed by Kathleen Edwards, Keller Williams Bedford NH-Realty, Bill Weidacher. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Angela B. Martin, Esquire, #2 Certificate of Service)(Chabot, Pierre)
January 26, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction Insufficient Service of Process, and Failure to State a Claim, #17 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction Insufficient Service of Process, and Failure to State a Claim filed by Baboucar B. Taal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Taal, Baboucar)
January 26, 2023 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction , for Failure to State a Claim, For Improper Venue, and For Failure to Plead With Particularity filed by Baboucar B. Taal. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Taal, Baboucar) Link clarified on 1/26/2023 (law).
January 12, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction Insufficient Service of Process, and Failure to State a Claim filed by Valerie Raudonis. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Valerie C. Raudonis, #2 Certificate of Service)(Shahi, Kaveh)
January 12, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kaveh S. Shahi, Esq on behalf of Valerie Raudonis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shahi, Kaveh)
January 11, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction Insufficient Service of Process, and Failure to State a Claim filed by Welts, White & Fontaine P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael J. Fontaine, #2 Certificate of Service)(Shahi, Kaveh)
January 11, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kaveh S. Shahi, Esq on behalf of Welts, White & Fontaine P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shahi, Kaveh)
January 11, 2023 Filing 13 PARTIALLY ASSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File #12 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction , for Failure to State a Claim, For Improper Venue, and For Failure to Plead With Particularity filed by Kathleen Edwards, Keller Williams Bedford NH-Realty, Bill Weidacher. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Chabot, Pierre)
January 11, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction , for Failure to State a Claim, For Improper Venue, and For Failure to Plead With Particularity filed by Kathleen Edwards, Keller Williams Bedford NH-Realty, Bill Weidacher. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of William Weidacher, #3 Affidavit of Kathleen Edwards, #4 Certificate of Service)(Chabot, Pierre)
January 9, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Danette Labrecque, Nathan Labrecque. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(law)
January 5, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Cronin, Cronin, Bisson & Zalinsky, P.C. (law)
January 5, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by John Cronin.(law)
January 5, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Cronin, Bisson & Zalinsky, P.C. (law)
January 3, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Keller Williams Bedford NH-Realty served on 12/20/2022, answer due 1/10/2023.(law)
January 3, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Danette Labrecque served on 12/20/2022, answer due 1/10/2023.(law)
January 3, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Nathan Labrecque served on 12/21/2022, answer due 1/11/2023.(law)
January 3, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Welts, White & Fontaine P.C. served on 12/20/2022, answer due 1/10/2023.(law)
January 3, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Cronin, Bisson & Zalinsky, P.C. served on 12/20/2022, answer due 1/10/2023.(law)
January 3, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for the Clerk to Forward Copy of the Complaint to Defendants for Refusal of Service and Deem Them Served filed by Baboucar B. Taal. (Attachments: #1 Service Documents as to John Cronin, #2 Service Documents as to David Tencza, #3 Service Documents as to Kathleen Edwards, #4 Service Documents as to Jack White, #5 Service Documents as to Bill Weidacher)(law)
December 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Cronin, Cronin, Bisson & Zalinsky, P.C., Kathleen Edwards, Keller Williams Bedford NH-Realty, Danette Labrecque, Nathan Labrecque, Valerie Raudonis, David Tencza, Bill Weidacher, Welts, White & Fontaine P.C., Jack S. White filed by Baboucar B. Taal. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taal v. Cronin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baboucar B. Taal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danette Labrecque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Labrecque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Raudonis
Represented By: Kaveh S. Shahi, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Tencza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack S. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cronin, Bisson & Zalinsky, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welts, White & Fontaine P.C.
Represented By: Kaveh S. Shahi, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Weidacher
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Edwards
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keller Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keller Williams Bedford NH-Realty
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?