Sea Shepherd Conservation Society v. Watson et al
Plaintiff: Sea Shepherd Conservation Society
Defendant: Paul Watson, Captain Paul Watson Foundation and Sea Shepherd Origins
Case Number: 2:2022cv00227
Filed: December 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY to Response to #18 SPECIAL MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint filed by Captain Paul Watson Foundation, Sea Shepherd Origins, Paul Watson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(Byrne, Matthew)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sea Shepherd Conservation Society re #29 Response in Opposition to #17 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction.(Judge, Jr., Walter) Link added on 2/21/2023 (law).
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lindsay Dischley, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Index of Exhibits)(Judge, Jr., Walter)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 SPECIAL MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint filed by Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Abigail J. Remore, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Borick, Matthew)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #25 Reply to Response to #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. The declaration of Alex Cornelissen was uploaded with its exhibit as a singular PDF. The document has been broken apart and reattached on the docket. Also, the required Index of Exhibits was not included at the time of filing. These documents are now separately attached to #25 and this entry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Index of Exhibits) (law)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sea Shepherd Conservation Society re #25 Reply to Response to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.(Judge, Jr., Walter) Text clarified on 1/31/2023 (law).
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY to Response to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pritam Singh, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Declaration of Alex Cornelissen, #6 Declaration of Abigail J. Remore, #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10, #17 Exhibit 11, #18 Exhibit 12, #19 Exhibit 13, #20 Exhibit 14, #21 Exhibit 15)(Judge, Jr., Walter) Attachment descriptions clarified, Attachment 5 replaced and Additional attachment(s) added on 1/31/2023: #22 Exhibit 1 (to Declaration of Alex Cornelissen) and #23 Index of Exhibits) (law).
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Admission of Israel Dahan Pro Hac Vice; granting #23 Motion for Admission of Bruce W. Baber Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 1/27/2023. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bruce W. Baber, Esq. filed by Captain Paul Watson Foundation, Sea Shepherd Origins, Paul Watson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(jlh)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Hearing re #18 SPECIAL MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint , #17 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Captain Paul Watson Foundation, Sea Shepherd Origins, Paul Watson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Byrne, Matthew) Event/text clarified on 1/26/2023 (law).
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Israel Dahan filed by Captain Paul Watson Foundation, Sea Shepherd Origins, Paul Watson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(law)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Sea Shepherd Origins (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Byrne, Matthew)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Captain Paul Watson Foundation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Byrne, Matthew)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SPECIAL MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint filed by Captain Paul Watson Foundation, Sea Shepherd Origins, Paul Watson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Byrne, Matthew)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Captain Paul Watson Foundation, Sea Shepherd Origins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Byrne, Matthew) Text clarified on 1/24/2023 (law).
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Captain Paul Watson Foundation, Sea Shepherd Origins, Paul Watson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Certificate of Service)(Byrne, Matthew)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Stipulated Motion to Exceed Page Limit re: Briefing on #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 1/19/2023. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #13 STIPULATED MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit Re: Briefing on #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. The document has been replaced to correct typos. The corrected document is now attached to #13 and this entry. (law)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATED MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit Re: Briefing on #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sea Shepherd Conservation Society.(Judge, Jr., Walter) (Link added and Main Document 13 replaced on 1/19/2023) (law).
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPLY to Response to #9 MOTION for Hearing re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Judge, Jr., Walter)
January 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Sea Shepherd Conservation Society (Judge, Jr., Walter)
January 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Hearing re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Captain Paul Watson Foundation, Sea Shepherd Origins, Paul Watson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Byrne, Matthew)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Hearing re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sea Shepherd Conservation Society.(Judge, Jr., Walter) Event/text clarified, link added on 1/17/2023 (law).
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: defendants answer due by 2/27/2023; defendants opposition to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction due by 1/23/2023 and plaintiff's reply by 1/30/2023.. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 1/11/2023. (law)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and Proposed Order as to Briefing Schedule re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Sea Shepherd Conservation Society (Judge, Jr., Walter) Link added on 1/11/2023 (law).
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission of Abigail J. Remore Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion for Admission of Lindsay A. Dischley Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 1/10/2023. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lindsay A. Dischley, Esq. filed by Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lindsay A. Dischley, #2 Exhibit A)(jlh)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Abigail J. Remore, Esq. filed by Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Abigail J. Remore, #2 Exhibit A)(jlh)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MAILED Form AO 120 to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office (document is sealed). (law)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of Pritam Singh, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Declaration of Abigail J. Remore, Esq., #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit 20, #25 Proposed Order)(law)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Captain Paul Watson Foundation, Sea Shepherd Origins, Paul Watson filed by Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Schedule A, #19 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sea Shepherd Conservation Society v. Watson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sea Shepherd Conservation Society
Represented By: Walter E. Judge, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Abigail J. Remore, Esq.
Represented By: Lindsay A. Dischley, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Watson
Represented By: Bruce W. Baber, Esq.
Represented By: Israel Dahan, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew B. Byrne, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Paul Watson Foundation
Represented By: Bruce W. Baber, Esq.
Represented By: Israel Dahan, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew B. Byrne, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea Shepherd Origins
Represented By: Bruce W. Baber, Esq.
Represented By: Israel Dahan, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew B. Byrne, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?