Goodnough v. Internal Revenue Service
Plaintiff: Michael Lawrence Goodnough
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 2:2023cv00490
Filed: October 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Kevin J Doyle
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Recovery of IRS Tax
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2023 ISSUED Local Rule 73 Form to Defendant.(drg)
December 5, 2023 Filing 7 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Michael Lawrence Goodnough (drg)
December 5, 2023 ISSUED Summons as to Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(drg)
November 7, 2023 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service filed by Michael Lawrence Goodnough. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(drg)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from the prison account of Michael Lawrence Goodnough. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 11/7/2023. (drg)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 11/7/2023. (drg)
November 1, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Michael Lawrence Goodnough(drg)
October 12, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Michael Lawrence Goodnough.(drg)
October 12, 2023 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Michael Lawrence Goodnough (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael L. Goodnough, #2 Inmate Account Summary, #3 Proposed Complaint)(drg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodnough v. Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lawrence Goodnough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?