Vermont Federation of Sportsmen's Clubs et al v. Birmingham et al
Plaintiff: Vermont Federation of Sportsmen's Clubs, Powderhorn Outdoor Sports Center, Inc., JPC, Inc. doing business as Black Dog Shooting Supplies, Paul Dame and Marsha J. Thompson
Defendant: Matthew Birmingham, Charity Clark and Sarah George
Case Number: 2:2023cv00710
Filed: December 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Kevin J Doyle
Referring Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2024 Filing 23 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Initial Disclosures by Matthew Birmingham, Charity Clark, Sarah George.(Groff, David)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying as moot #20 CONSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 2/6/2024. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OPINION AND ORDER granting #19 STIPULATED MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit for Opposition as to #2 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction; granting #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (response due by 2/21/2024); denying as moot #17 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time Rule 26(f) Conference and Filing Discovery Schedule and #14 MOTION for Court to Direct Scheduling Order Consolidating Preliminary Injunction Motion With the Merits. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 2/6/2024. (law)
February 6, 2024 Filing 20 CONSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit filed by Matthew Birmingham, Charity Clark, Sarah George. (Donofrio, Michael)
January 30, 2024 Filing 19 STIPULATED MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit for Opposition as to #2 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Matthew Birmingham, Charity Clark, Sarah George. (Groff, David) Text clarified/link added on 1/30/2024 (law).
January 30, 2024 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Matthew Birmingham, Charity Clark, Sarah George.(Groff, David)
January 24, 2024 Filing 17 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time Rule 26(f) Conference and Filing Discovery Schedule filed by Matthew Birmingham, Charity Clark, Sarah George. (Groff, David)
January 23, 2024 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION for Court to Direct Scheduling Order Consolidating Preliminary Injunction Motion With the Merits filed by Matthew Birmingham, Charity Clark, Sarah George. (Groff, David)
January 22, 2024 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION for Court to Direct Scheduling Order Consolidating Preliminary Injunction Motion With the Merits filed by Paul Dame, JPC, Inc., Powderhorn Outdoor Sports Center, Inc., Marsha J. Thompson, Vermont Federation of Sportsmen's Clubs. (Hardin, Matthew)
January 17, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION for Court to Direct Scheduling Order Consolidating Preliminary Injunction Motion With the Merits filed by Matthew Birmingham, Charity Clark, Sarah George. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Groff, #2 Exhibit A)(Groff, David). Added MOTION for Court to Direct Scheduling Order on 1/17/2024 (law)
January 10, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit filed by Paul Dame, Marsha J. Thompson, Vermont Federation of Sportsmen's Clubs, JPC, Inc., Powderhorn Outdoor Sports Center, Inc. The required Index of Exhibits was not included at the time of filing. The index is now attached to #2 and this entry. (law)
January 10, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael N. Donofrio, Esq on behalf of Matthew Birmingham, Charity Clark, Sarah George.(Donofrio, Michael)
January 10, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bridget C. Asay, Esq on behalf of Matthew Birmingham, Charity Clark, Sarah George.(Asay, Bridget)
January 9, 2024 Filing 10 CASE Reassigned to Judge William K. Sessions III. Case assigned to Judge Christina Reiss in error. (drg)
January 9, 2024 Filing 9 CASE Reassigned to Judge Christina Reiss. Judge Kevin J. Doyle no longer assigned to the case. (drg)
January 9, 2024 Filing 8 OBJECTION to Direct Assignment by Matthew Birmingham, Charity Clark, Sarah George (drg)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 MOTION to Exceed Page Limit of Memorandum in Support of #2 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 1/3/2024. (This is a text-only Order.) (drg) Link added on 1/10/2024 (law).
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants shall file their answer and their response to #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before 1/30/2024. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 12/27/2023. (This is a text-only Order.) (drg)
December 21, 2023 Filing 5 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Matthew Birmingham, Charity Clark, Sarah George. (Groff, David) Text clarified on 1/10/2024 (law).
December 21, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David R. Groff, Esq on behalf of Matthew Birmingham, Charity Clark, Sarah George.(Groff, David)
December 21, 2023 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Def LR73 due 1/11/2024 (drg)
December 20, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Attachment 2, Exhibit A replaced with flattened PDF. Flattened document also attached to this entry. (drg)
December 20, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; MOTION to Exceed Page Limit of Memorandum filed by Paul Dame, JPC, Inc., Powderhorn Outdoor Sports Center, Inc., Marsha J. Thompson, Vermont Federation of Sportsmen's Clubs (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Hardin, Matthew). Docket text corrected and Motion to Exceed Page Limit added on 12/20/2023 (drg). (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/20/2023) (drg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/10/2024: #9 Index of Exhibits) (law).
December 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Matthew Birmingham, Charity Clark, Sarah George filed by Marsha J. Thompson, JPC, Inc., Powderhorn Outdoor Sports Center, Inc., Vermont Federation of Sportsmen's Clubs, Paul Dame. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(drg)
December 18, 2023 ISSUED Summons as to Matthew Birmingham, Charity Clark, Sarah George.(drg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vermont Federation of Sportsmen's Clubs et al v. Birmingham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vermont Federation of Sportsmen's Clubs
Represented By: Brady C. Toensing, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew D. Hardin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Powderhorn Outdoor Sports Center, Inc.
Represented By: Brady C. Toensing, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew D. Hardin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPC, Inc. doing business as Black Dog Shooting Supplies
Represented By: Brady C. Toensing, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew D. Hardin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Dame
Represented By: Brady C. Toensing, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew D. Hardin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha J. Thompson
Represented By: Brady C. Toensing, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew D. Hardin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Birmingham
Represented By: Bridget C. Asay, Esq.
Represented By: David R. Groff, Esq.
Represented By: Michael N. Donofrio, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charity Clark
Represented By: Bridget C. Asay, Esq.
Represented By: David R. Groff, Esq.
Represented By: Michael N. Donofrio, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah George
Represented By: Bridget C. Asay, Esq.
Represented By: David R. Groff, Esq.
Represented By: Michael N. Donofrio, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?