Bronson v. Leduc
Plaintiff: MSj. Mcp, QMHP Howard F Bronson and Howard F Bronson
Defendant: MA, LADC Greg Leduc and Greg Leduc
Case Number: 2:2024cv00418
Filed: April 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3730 Qui Tam False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2024 Filing 19 STIPULATED MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Disposition of #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Greg Leduc (Peters, Mark) Modified on 5/31/2024 to clarify text/link entries (sjl).
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #5 and #6 MOTIONS for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark W. Peters and Devin J. Dunkley respectively. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 4/18/2024. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
April 17, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal by Greg Leduc. (originally filed 4/17/2024 in state court) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (sjl)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Permission to File Addendum to Original March 19th #10 Complaint. Signed by Superior Court Judge David Barra on 4/15/2024. (originally filed 4/15/2024 in state court) (sjl)
April 17, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Permission to File Second Addendum to Original March 19th #10 Complaint filed by Howard F Bronson. (originally filed 4/5/2024 in state court) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Mailing) (sjl)
April 17, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Permission to File Addendum to Original March 19th #10 Complaint filed by Howard F Bronson. (originally filed 4/1/2024 in state court) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (sjl)
April 17, 2024 Filing 13 ISSUED Summons as to Greg Leduc. (originally filed on 3/20/2024 in state court) (sjl)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Application to Waive Filing Fees and Service Costs. Signed by State Court Clerk on 3/18/2024. (Originally filed on 3/20/2024 in state court) (sjl)
April 17, 2024 Filing 11 APPLICATION to Waive Filing Fees and Service Costs filed by Howard F Bronson. (originally filed 3/19/2024 in state court) (sjl)
April 17, 2024 Filing 10 COMPLAINT against Greg Leduc filed by Howard F Bronson. (originally filed 3/19/2024 in state court) (sjl)
April 17, 2024 Filing 9 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (sjl)
April 17, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #6 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Devin J. Dunkley filed by Greg Leduc. The exhibits were uploaded as a singular PDF and have been broken apart. The corrected documents are now attached to #6 as well as this entry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (jh)
April 17, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #5 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Mark W. Peters filed by Greg Leduc. The exhibits were uploaded as a singular PDF and have been broken apart. The corrected documents are now attached to #5 as well as this entry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (jh)
April 17, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Devin J. Dunkley (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number AVTDC-1909626) filed by Greg Leduc (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Devin J. Dunkley)(Nolan, Jeffrey) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/17/2024) (jh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/17/2024: #2 Exhibit 1) (jh).
April 17, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Mark W. Peters (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number AVTDC-1909613) filed by Greg Leduc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nolan, Jeffrey) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/17/2024) (jh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/17/2024: #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (jh)
April 17, 2024 Filing 4 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Windham Unit, Civil Division, requesting original case file and certified docket sheet. (sjl)
April 17, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Greg Leduc. The Civil Cover Sheet has been replaced to remove editable fields and the instruction page. The corrected document is now attached to #1 and this entry. (sjl)
April 17, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Greg Leduc (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Nolan, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/17/2024 to clarify attachment (sjl).
April 17, 2024 This case is assigned to Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. (kac)
April 16, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Greg Leduc from Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Windham Unit, case number 24-cv-01092. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AVTDC-1909416) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Nolan, Jeffrey) Filing date corrected on 4/17/2024 due to pay.gov unavailability. (jh). (Attachment 1 replaced and text/attachments clarified on 4/17/2024) (sjl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bronson v. Leduc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSj. Mcp, QMHP Howard F Bronson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard F Bronson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MA, LADC Greg Leduc
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Nolan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Leduc
Represented By: Devin J. Dunkley, Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Nolan, Esq.
Represented By: Mark W. Peters, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?