Prevost v. Brice et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Prevost
Defendant: Angela Brice and North Country Community College
Other: ENE Evaluator
Case Number: 2:2024cv00425
Filed: April 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Withdrawal and Substitution of Affidavit by Stephen Prevost re #20 Response to #19 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply re: #3 Motion for Summary Judgment On Liability. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dominic Bove)(Carleton, Ian) Link/text clarified on 6/5/2024 (law).
June 3, 2024 Filing 21 JUDICIAL DISCLOSURE as to #20 Response to #19 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply re: #3 Motion for Summary Judgment On Liability. Counsel to advise court of their preference within 10 days. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 6/3/2024. (law)
May 31, 2024 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #19 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply re: #3 Motion for Summary Judgment On Liability And Request for Hearing filed by Stephen Prevost. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Carleton, Ian) Text clarified on 6/3/2024 (law).
May 30, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Angela Brice, North Country Community College re: #3 Motion for Summary Judgment On Liability. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Jr., Shapleigh) Text clarified, link added on 5/30/2024 (law).
May 23, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY UPDATE re: #13 Reply to Response to #3 Motion for Summary Judgment On Liability filed by Stephen Prevost. Exhibit 2 has been received and the thumb drive is now on file with Clerk's Office. (law)
May 23, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY REMOVAL: Document 16 has been removed from the docket as duplicative of #15 . (law)
May 23, 2024 Filing 16 Entry removed from the docket.
May 23, 2024 Filing 15 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - First Set of Request for Admissions, First Set of Interrogatories and Requests to Produce by Stephen Prevost.(Carleton, Ian) Text clarified on 5/23/2024 (law).
May 23, 2024 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by Stephen Prevost to Correct Oversight re: #12 Response in Opposition to Defendants Rule 56(d) Request For Discovery and #13 Reply to Response to #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability. (Carleton, Ian) Link added, text clarified on 5/23/2024 (law).
May 22, 2024 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability filed by Stephen Prevost. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (thumb drive on file with Clerk's Office)(Carleton, Ian) Text clarified on 5/23/2024 (law).
May 22, 2024 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition To Defendants Rule 56(d) Request For Discovery by Stephen Prevost. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Carleton, Ian)
May 17, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition to #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability filed by Angela Brice, North Country Community College. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Shapleigh Smith, Jr.)(Smith, Jr., Shapleigh) Text clarified on 5/20/2024 (law).
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE/ORDER: Discovery due by 2/14/2025; Motions due by 11/15/2024; Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/10/2024 at 09:00 AM; Ready for Trial by 2/14/2025. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 5/15/2024. (law)
May 14, 2024 Filing 9 ASSIGNED Early Neutral Evaluator: Gregory S. Clayton, Esq. (law)
May 14, 2024 Filing 8 PROPOSED Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order by Stephen Prevost.(Carleton, Ian)
April 25, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shapleigh Smith, Jr., Esq on behalf of Angela Brice, North Country Community College.(Smith, Jr., Shapleigh)
April 24, 2024 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Angela Brice waiver sent on 4/18/2024, answer due 6/17/2024.(Carleton, Ian)
April 24, 2024 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: North Country Community College waiver sent on 4/18/2024, answer due 6/17/2024.(Carleton, Ian)
April 22, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY UPDATE re: #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability filed by Stephen Prevost. Exhibits 5 and 6 having been received on disks, are now on file in Clerk's Office. (law)
April 19, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability filed by Stephen Prevost. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5 (disk on file with Clerk's Office), #8 Exhibit 6 (disk on file with Clerk's Office), #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9)(Carleton, Ian) Text clarified on 4/22/2024 (law).
April 18, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #1 Complaint filed by Stephen Prevost. The JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet has been replaced as it was still in a fillable format and the instructional page has been removed. The flattened and corrected document is now attached to #1 and this entry.Also, Exhibit 1 has been received on disk and is on file with the Clerk's Office. (law)
April 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Angela Brice, North Country Community College filed by Stephen Prevost. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AVTDC-1910479) (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 (disk on file with Clerk's Office), #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carleton, Ian) Text clarified on 4/18/2024 (law). (Attachment 7 replaced on 4/18/2024) (law).
April 18, 2024 This case is assigned to Judge Christina Reiss. (kac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prevost v. Brice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Prevost
Represented By: Ian P. Carleton, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Brice
Represented By: Shapleigh Smith, Jr., Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Country Community College
Represented By: Shapleigh Smith, Jr., Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: ENE Evaluator
Represented By: Gregory S. Clayton, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?