Puppolo v. Welch et al
Defendant: John J. Welch, Jr. and John J. Welch, Jr., LTD.
Case Number: 5:2014cv00095
Filed: May 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Office: Rutland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 OPINION AND ORDER Granting 88 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 6/19/2018. (pac)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER denying 94 MOTION for Recusal, and denying 99 MOTION to Supplement with Submission of Counsel's Certificate of Good Faith re: 94 MOTION for Recusal. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 1/31/2018. (pjl)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 OPINION AND ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Admit Audio Recordings, Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Motion for Expenses, Granting Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Thomas O'Toole, and Granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Legal Malpractice Claim. (Docs. 42 and 76 ). Signed by Chief Judge Christina Reiss on 9/12/2017. (pac)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puppolo v. Welch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Welch, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Welch, Jr., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?