Bryan v. Menard et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Howard Bryan
Defendant: Lisa Menard and Steven Fisher
Case Number: 5:2016cv00157
Filed: June 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Office: Rutland Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: John M. Conroy
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W. Crawford
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Adopting 107 Report and Recommendation granting 103 Motion for Summary Judgment and 72 Second Amended Complaint is dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 3/6/2018. (law)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Adopting 90 Report and Recommendation granting 77 Motion for Summary Judgment. Claims against Correct Care Solutions and against Jane or John Doe are DISMISSED with prejudice re: 72 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 7/10/2017. (esb) Text clarified on 7/11/2017 (jlh).
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER denying as moot 52 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; affirming, approving and adopting Report and Recommendations re 76 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 6/20/2017. (esb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryan v. Menard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Howard Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Menard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?