United States of America v. Bonnell
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Robert Bonnell
Case Number: 5:2018cv00148
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Robert Bonnell served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (esb)
October 16, 2018 ISSUED Summons as to Robert Bonnell.(kac)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Reassignment pursuant to Local Rule 73(d). Case reassigned to Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. Judge John M. Conroy no longer assigned to the case. (law)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 OBJECTION to Direct Assignment by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (eh)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Bonnell filed by United States of America. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Melissa A. D. Ranaldo, AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?