Hendrickson v. Vermont Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Darryl Hendrickson
Defendant: Rick Burns, Giovanna Zaccaria, Vermont Department of Corrections, Burlington Courthouse, Emily Tredeau and Prisoners' Rights Office
Case Number: 5:2018cv00158
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff to file an Application for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis or pay filing fee re #1 Complaint within 30 days. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 11/19/2018. (hbc)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-04151.
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER FORTHWITH THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF VERMONT. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MARK THIS MATTER AS CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 9/28/18. 9/28/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PROSE PLAINTIFF.(er, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/1/2018.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/1/2018.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against "PRISONERS" RIGHTS OFFICE, BURLINGTON COURTHOUSE, RICK BURNS, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION OF VERMONT, EMILY TREDEAN, GIOVANNA ZACCARIA (NO FEE, NO IFP), filed by DARRYL HENDRICKSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets, #2 Envelope)(ahf) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/28/2018) (afm, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/1/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendrickson v. Vermont Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giovanna Zaccaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vermont Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burlington Courthouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Tredeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prisoners' Rights Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Hendrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?