Safeco Insurance Company of America v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Defendant: BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., LG Corporation and LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00179
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE re #22 Potential Evaluators Letter Sent by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (eh)
December 28, 2018 Filing 22 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 1/14/2019. (eh)
December 27, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Case Reassignment pursuant to Local Rule 73(d). Case reassigned to Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. Judge John M. Conroy no longer assigned to the case. (law)
December 27, 2018 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cain, Robert)
December 27, 2018 Filing 19 OBJECTION to Direct Assignment by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Cain, Robert)
December 27, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc..(Cain, Robert)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Complaint. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. answer due 12/28/2018. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 12/27/2018. (This is a text-only Order.) (hbc)
December 20, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Complaint filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cain, Robert)
December 13, 2018 Filing 15 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (eh)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Defendant BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc.'s Magistrate Judge Assignment Form due by 12/28/2018. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 12/13/2018. (hbc)
December 10, 2018 ISSUED Summons as to LG Corporation.(law)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 ASSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to serve notice of magistrate on all parties. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 12/10/2018. (This is a text-only Order.) (hbc)
December 10, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #11 ASSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to serve notice of magistrate on all parties filed by BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc. The main document was combined with that of its exhibit. The images have been broken apart and replaced on the docket. The images are now separately attached to #11 as well as to this entry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (hbc)
December 7, 2018 Filing 11 ASSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to serve notice of magistrate on all parties filed by BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc. (Devine, Laura) (Main Document 11 replaced, Additional attachment added, text clarified on 12/10/2018: #1 Exhibit 1) (hbc).
November 29, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc. (Devine, Laura)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Foote, Richard) Party served and date answer due added on 11/29/2018 (hbc).
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time for Service of #5 Complaint. Signed by Judge Michael R. Kainen on 11/5/2018. (originally filed 11/5/2018 in state court) (law)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of #5 Complaint filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Proposed Order, #10 Certificate of Service) (originally filed 10/17/2018 in state court) (law)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Special Handling Instructions by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (originally filed 9/10/2018 in state court) (law)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc., LG Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., #2 Summons as to LG Corporation, #3 Summons as to BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc.) (originally filed 8/30/2018 in state court) (law)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 RECEIVED FILE and copy of docket sheet from State Court. (law)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against LG Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. filed by BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc. (Fay, Thomas)
November 9, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Local Rule 73 Deadline (Dft) due 12/3/2018 as to BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc. (hbc)
November 9, 2018 ISSUED Local Rule 73 Forms to defendant BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc.(law)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Windsor Unit requesting original file and certified docket sheet. (law)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc. from Vermont Superior Court, Windsor Unit, Civil Division, case number 389-8-18. ( Filing fee $ 400) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Notice of Removal to All Adverse Parties, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Service)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safeco Insurance Company of America v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Fay, Esq.
Represented By: Laura D. Devine, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Richard P. Foote, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?