Goodrich v. Ravin Crossbows, LLC

Plaintiff: Ernest Goodrich
Defendant: Ravin Crossbows, LLC
Undetermined: ENE Evaluator
Case Number: 5:2018cv00186
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ravin Crossbows, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sutton, Barry)
December 21, 2018 Filing 22 PROPOSED Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order by Ernest Goodrich.(Bergman, Elijah)
December 19, 2018 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition to #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ernest Goodrich. (Attachments: #1 Document removed, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Affidavit of Ernest A. Goodrich, #6 Statement of Disputed Material Facts, #7 Statement of Undisputed Facts Response)(Bergman, Elijah) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/20/2018) (jlh).
December 12, 2018 Filing 20 ASSIGNED Early Neutral Evaluator: Eric A. Johnson, Esq. (eh)
December 11, 2018 Filing 19 STIPULATION AS TO ENE by all parties.(Werle, Mark)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Barry B. Sutton. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 12/4/2018. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
December 3, 2018 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Ravin Crossbows, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Werle, Mark)
December 3, 2018 Filing 16 ENE LETTER to counsel re ENE by Stipulation due by 12/14/2018. (hbc)
November 30, 2018 Filing 15 EVALUATOR SELECTION Response by Ravin Crossbows, LLC(Werle, Mark)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mariah S. Mumford. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 11/30/2018. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
November 29, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing by Ravin Crossbows, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (originally filed 11/13/2018 in state court)(esb)
November 29, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE with 12 V.S.A. 856 by Ernest Goodrich (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (originally filed 10/24/2018 in state court) (esb)
November 29, 2018 ISSUED Summons as to Ravin Crossbows, LLC. (originally filed 10/5/2018 in state court)(esb)
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 COMPLAINT against Ravin Crossbows, LLC filed by Ernest Goodrich. (originally filed 10/5/2018 in state court) (esb)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (esb)
November 28, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Mariah S. Mumford filed by Ravin Crossbows, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(jlh)
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Barry B. Sutton filed by Ravin Crossbows, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(jlh)
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ravin Crossbows, LLC. The main document was not signed and has been replaced. The certificate of service had the incorrect docket number and has been replaced. The corrected documents are now attached to #6 as well as this entry. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (jlh)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ravin Crossbows, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Certificate of Service)(Werle, Mark) (Main Document 6 replaced on 11/21/2018) (jlh) (Attachment 7 replaced on 11/21/2018) (jlh).
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 11/30/2018. (eh)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Addison Unit, Civil Division requesting certified copy of docket sheet and original file (esb)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ravin Crossbows, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal and #2 Answer to Complaint. (esb)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Ravin Crossbows, LLC. (esb)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ravin Crossbows, LLC from Vermont Superior Court, Addison Unit, Civil Division, case number 180-10-18-Ancv. ( Filing fee $ 400) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodrich v. Ravin Crossbows, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Goodrich
Represented By: Elijah R. Bergman, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ravin Crossbows, LLC
Represented By: Mark F. Werle, Esq.
Represented By: Barry B. Sutton, Esq.
Represented By: Mariah S. Mumford, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ENE Evaluator
Represented By: Eric A. Johnson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?