Horn v. Madison National Life Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Jennifer Horn
Defendant: Madison National Life Insurance Co.
Undetermined: ENE Evaluator
Case Number: 5:2018cv00199
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE/ORDER Discovery due by 8/4/2019. Motions due by 8/30/2019. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/6/2019 at 09:00 AM. Ready for Trial by 11/1/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 1/23/2019. (esb)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Emily M. Feinstein. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 1/23/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Emily M. Feinstein filed by Madison National Life Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(jlh)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 ASSIGNED Early Neutral Evaluator: Michael J. Marks, Esq. (eh)
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order by Jennifer Horn.(Jarvis, Craig)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #6 Answer to Complaint filed by Madison National Life Insurance Co. The document has been replaced to correct numbering. The corrected document is now attached to #6 as well as this entry. (jlh)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 12/24/2018. (eh)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Madison National Life Insurance Co..(Carleton, Ian) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/18/2018) (jlh).
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Madison National Life Insurance Co. filed by Jennifer Horn. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand, #2 Receipt of Payment) (esb)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (esb)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Windsor Unit, Civil Division requesting a certified copy of the docket sheet and the complete original file. (esb)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Madison National Life Insurance Co. (esb)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Madison National Life Insurance Co. from Vermont Superior Court, Windsor Unit, Civil Division, case number 456-10-18-Wrcv. ( Filing fee $ 400) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb) Text clarified on 1/2/2019 (law).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horn v. Madison National Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison National Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Ian P. Carleton, Esq.
Represented By: Emily M. Feinstein, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Horn
Represented By: Craig A. Jarvis, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ENE Evaluator
Represented By: Michael J. Marks, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?