Wilmington Trust, National Association v. Foster et al

Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust, National Association
Defendant: Chandler Foster, M. Patricia Foster and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00211
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 66 STIPULATED DISCOVERY LETTER SENT re: no stipulated discovery schedule filed; case will be set for a scheduling conference unless stipulated schedule is filed. (pjl)
January 7, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE by Chandler Foster, M. Patricia Foster re #1 Notice of Removal. (originally filed 12/7/2018 in the state court) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Completion to Bennington Civil. (originally filed 12/21/2018 in the Supreme Court of the State of Vermont) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ENTRY ORDER granting #62 Motion to Dismiss #58 Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge Unassigned on 11/8/2018. (originally filed 11/8/2018 in the Supreme Court of the State of Vermont) (esb) Text clarified on 1/22/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION to Dismiss #58 Notice of Appeal filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (originally filed 11/7/2018 in the Supreme Court of the State of Vermont) (esb) Link added on 1/22/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Filing 61 DOCKETING STATEMENT. (originally filed 11/14/2018 in the Supreme Court of the State of Vermont) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 60 TRANSMITTAL OF APPEAL to Vermont Supreme Court. (originally filed 10/29/2018 in the Supreme Court of the State of Vermont) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Assignment of Case Number. (originally filed 10/29/2018 in the Supreme Court of the State of Vermont) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Chandler Foster, M. Patricia Foster. (originally filed 10/29/2018 in the Supreme Court of the State of Vermont) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ENTRY ORDER denying #54 Motion for Leave to Appeal. Signed by Judge David A. Barra on 9/26/2018. (originally filed 9/26/2018 in state court) (esb) Judge corrected on 1/22/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Filing 56 CERTIFIED COPY AND CERTIFICATE of Non-Redemption. (originally filed 9/26/2018 in state court) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 55 OBJECTION re #54 MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (originally filed 8/23/2018 in state court) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Chandler Foster, M. Patricia Foster. (originally filed 8/14/2018 in state court) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ENTRY ORDER granting Plaintiff's Requested Expenses. Signed by Judge William D. Cohen on 1/14/2019. (originally filed 7/13/2018 in state court) (esb) Judge corrected on 1/22/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 JUDGMENT ORDER, DECREE of Foreclosure and Order for Judicial Sale. Signed by Judge David A. Barra on 7/31/2018. (originally filed 7/31/2018 in state court) (esb) Judge corrected on 1/22/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Filing 51 CLERK'S ACCOUNTING (originally filed 7/13/2018 in state court) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ENTRY ORDER denying #19 Motion for Stay. Signed by Judge David A. Barra on 6/11/2018. (originally filed 6/12/2018 in state court) (esb) Judge corrected on 1/22/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ENTRY ORDER denying #46 Motion to Vacate #35 Order granting #31 Motion for Default Judgment, MOTION to Strike the Pleading from the Docket. Signed by Judge David A. Barra on 5/31/2018. (originally filed 5/31/2018 in state court) (esb) Judge corrected on 1/22/2019 (jlh). Text clarified on 1/28/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone. Signed by Judge David A. Barra on 4/26/2018. (originally filed 4/30/2018 in state court) (esb) Judge corrected on 1/22/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Filing 47 OBJECTION to #46 MOTION to Vacate #35 ENTRY ORDER granting #31 Motion for Default, MOTION to Strike the Pleading from the Docket. filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (originally filed 5/14/2018 in state court) (esb) Text clarified on 1/28/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Vacate #35 ENTRY ORDER granting #31 Motion for Default Judgment, MOTION to Strike the Pleading from the Docket. filed by Chandler Foster, M. Patricia Foster. (originally filed 5/3/2018 in state court) (esb) Text clarified on 1/28/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint by Chandler Foster, M. Patricia Foster.(originally filed 5/3/2018 in state court) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (originally filed 4/23/2018 in state court) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution. Jeffrey J. Hardiman substituted for Bozena Wysocki. (originally filed 4/12/2018 in state court) (esb) Text clarified on 1/22/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 05/03/2018 at 11:00 am. (originally filed 4/11/2018 in state court) (esb) Text clarified on 1/22/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Filing 41 OPPOSITION re #19 Motion to Stay by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (originally filed 12/28/2017 in state court) (esb) Link corrected on 1/28/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ENTRY ORDER granting #39 Motion to Attend Hearing Telephonically. Signed by Judge William D. Cohen on 12/21/2017. (originally filed 12/21/2017 in state court) (esb) Judge corrected on 1/22/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Attend Hearing Telephonically re #37 Order Setting Hearing on Motion filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (originally filed 12/8/2017 in state court) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Hearing on #19 Motion to Stay for 01/04/2018 at 9:30. (originally filed 11/27/2017 in state court) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ENTRY ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge William D. Cohen on 11/21/2017. (originally filed 11/21/2017 in state court) (esb) Judge corrected on 1/28/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE re #34 Entry Order re: #33 Affidavit of Attorney's Fees. by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (originally filed 9/27/2017 in state court) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ENTRY ORDER granting #31 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge William D. Cohen on 9/11/2017. (originally filed 9/12/2017 in state court) (esb) Judge clarified on 1/22/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: re #33 Affidavit of Attorney's Fees. Signed by Judge William D. Cohen on 9/11/2017. (originally filed 9/12/2017 in state court) (esb) Judge corrected on 1/22/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT for Attorney's Fees of Rachel Jones, Esq. by Wilmington Trust, National Association (originally filed 8/18/2017 in state court) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association. Non-Military Service served upon Chandler Foster, M. Patricia Foster, M. Foster, Patricia Foster on 8/17/2017. (originally filed 8/18/2017 in state court) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Default Judgment and Issuance of Clerk's Accounting filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (originally filed 8/18/2017 in state court) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Filing of Certification of Counsel by Wilmington Trust, National Association (Bank of America). (originally filed 8/18/2017 in state court) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Shorten Redemption Period filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association.(originally filed 8/18/2017 in state court) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ENTRY ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge John W. Valente on 8/2/2017. (originally filed 8/2/2017 in state court) (esb) Judge corrected on 1/22/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Default Judgment filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (originally filed 8/1/2017 in state court) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENTRY ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge John W. Valente on 6/21/2017. (originally filed 6/21/2017 in state court) (esb) Judge corrected on 1/22/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Default Judgment filed by Bank of America. (originally filed 6/20/2017 in state court) (esb) Filer clarified on 1/22/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge John W. Valente on 6/21/2017. (originally filed 6/21/2017 in state court) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association (Bank of America). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (originally filed 6/19/2017 in state court) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENTRY ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge John W. Valente on 4/19/2017. (originally filed 4/19/2017 in state court) (esb) Judge corrected on 1/22/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Default Judgment filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association (Bank of America). (originally filed 4/13/2017 in state court) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENTRY ORDER granting #19 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Default Judgment. Case stayed until 2/15/2017, then pltf has 60 days to file a Motio for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge John W. Valente on 11/2/2016. (originally filed 11/3/2016 in state court) (esb) Text clarified Modified on 1/22/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Default Judgment filed by Bank of America, N.A. (originally filed 10/21/2016 in state court) (esb). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File on 1/22/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Filing 18 ENTRY ORDER denying #12 Motion for Mediation and granting Staying of Case. Signed by John W. Valente on 7/14/2016. (originally filed 7/18/2016 in state court) (esb) Judge corrected on 1/22/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE re #16 Entry Order by Chandler Foster, M. Patricia Foster. (originally filed 7/11/2016 in state court) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENTRY ORDER: re #12 Motion for Mediation. Deft has until 7/7/16 to provide court with affidavit. Signed by Judge John W. Valente on 6/22/2016. (originally filed 6/27/2016 in state court) (esb) Judge corrected on 1/22/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. M. Patricia Foster served on 5/30/2016, answer due 6/20/2016. (originally filed 6/22/2016 in state court) (esb) Text clarified on 1/22/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Chandler Foster served on 5/30/2016, answer due 6/20/2016. (originally filed 6/22/2016 in state court) (esb) Text clarified on 1/22/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Filing 13 OBJECTION to Defendants' #12 Request for Mediation by Bank of America, N.A. (originally filed 6/20/2016 in state court) (esb) Filer clarified on 1/22/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST For Mediation by Chandler Foster, M. Patricia Foster (originally filed 6/8/2016 in state court) (esb) Event/Text clarified on 1/22/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Chandler Foster. (originally filed 6/8/2016 in state court)(esb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Assigned Docket Number (originally filed 5/19/2016 in state court) (esb)
January 7, 2019 ISSUED Summons as to Chandler Foster, M. Patricia Foster and Occupants of 14 Old Ridge Road, Winhall, VT. (originally filed 5/17/2016 in state court)(esb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO OCCUPANT by Wilmington Trust, National Association (originally filed 5/17/2016 in state court) (esb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (originally filed 5/17/2016 in state court)(esb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Chandler Foster, M. Patricia Foster, Occupants of 14 Olde Ridge Road, Winhall, VT filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (originally filed 5/17/2016 in state court) (esb) Text clarified on 1/22/2019 (jlh).
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (esb) (Main Document 6 replaced on 1/22/2019) (jlh).
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Certificate of Service)(Webb, Marcus)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER (Amended) to Vermont Superior Court, Bennington Unit, Civil Division requesting certified copy of the docket sheet and complete original file. (Letter amended to include Plaintiff attorneys) (esb)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Bennington Unit, Civil Division requesting certified copy of the docket sheet and complete original file. (esb)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Chandler Foster. (esb)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chandler Foster, M. Patricia Foster from Vermont Superior Court, Bennington Unit, Civil Division, case number 113-5-16-Bncv. ( Filing fee $ 400) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Chandler Foster, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Trust, National Association v. Foster et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandler Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Patricia Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust, National Association
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Hardiman, Esq.
Represented By: Santo Longo, Esq.
Represented By: Marcus C. Webb, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?