TetherView, LLC v. Zuchowski et al
Plaintiff: TetherView, LLC
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Laura B. Zuchowski, Kirstjen Nielsen and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 5:2019cv00019
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service. Christina E. Nolan for L. Francis Cissna; Kirstjen Nielsen; U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services; U.S. Department of Homeland Security; Laura B. Zuchowski served on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Return receipt) (esb) Text clarified on 3/13/2019 (jlh)
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service. William Barr, U.S. Attorney General served on 2/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Return receipt) (esb)
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service. U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 2/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Return receipt) (esb)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service. L. Francis Cissna served on 2/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Return receipt) (esb)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service. Kirstjen Nielsen served on 2/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Return receipts) (esb)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service. Laura B. Zuchowski served on 2/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Return receipt) (esb)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 2/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Return receipt) (esb) Text clarified on 3/13/2019 (jlh).
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua S. Press, Esq on behalf of L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Laura B. Zuchowski.(Press, Joshua)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jessie M. Bless. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 2/6/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Jesse M. Bless filed by TetherView, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jesse M. Blass, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(jlh)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Laura B. Zuchowski filed by TetherView, LLC. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit C-2, #6 Exhibit C-3, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Certificate of Compliance, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TetherView, LLC v. Zuchowski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Joshua S. Press, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Joshua S. Press, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura B. Zuchowski
Represented By: Joshua S. Press, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Joshua S. Press, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: Joshua S. Press, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TetherView, LLC
Represented By: Jesse M. Bless, Esq.
Represented By: Leslie A. Holman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?