Hoover v. United States of America
Case Number: 5:2019cv00052
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Office: Rutland Office
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Accepting and Adopting 20 Report and Recommendation. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 22(b), a certificate of appealability is Denied and any appeal of this Order would not be taken in good faith, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3). Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 1/29/2020. (esb)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending judgement re 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus be entered in favor of the United States and that the case be closed. Objections due within 14 days of service. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 1/2/2020. (eh)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 OPINION AND ORDER: Petitioner's 18 MOTION to Amend is GRANTED. Any amended § 2255 motion must be filed within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 10/15/2019. (hbc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoover v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?