Tucker v. Real Time Resolutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Toby Tucker
Defendant: Real Time Resolutions, Inc. and PYOD, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00073
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. PYOD, LLC served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019.(Marcus, Ari)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Real Time Resolutions, Inc. waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019.(Marcus, Ari)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ari H. Marcus. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 6/6/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
May 31, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Ari H. Marcus filed by Toby Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ari H. Marcus, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Service)(jlh)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against PYOD, LLC, Real Time Resolutions, Inc. filed by Toby Tucker.Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Real Time Resolutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Time Resolutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PYOD, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toby Tucker
Represented By: Andrew B. Delaney, Esq.
Represented By: Ari H. Marcus, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?