Kew v. Town of Northfield, VT et al
Plaintiff: Debra Kew
Defendant: Brian Hoar, Michael Gero and Town of Northfield, VT
Case Number: 5:2019cv00078
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 7/29/2019. (eh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Michael Gero, Brian Hoar, Town of Northfield, VT. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Leddy, Michael)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Michael Gero, Brian Hoar, Town of Northfield, VT filed by Debra Kew. (originally filed 4/25/2019 in state court) (esb)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (esb)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' time to answer extended to July 8, 2019; granting #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File proposed Discovery Schedule. Time to file proposed Discovery Schedule extended to July 19, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 5/28/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Town of Northfield, Michael Gero and Brian Hoar. (esb) (Same images as #4 )
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Discovery Schedule filed by Debra Kew.(Coteus, Stephen). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File on 5/24/2019 (jlh). (Same images as #8 )).
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Washington Unit, Civil Division requesting a certified copy of the docket sheet and the complete original file. (esb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael J. Leddy, Esq on behalf of Michael Gero, Brian Hoar, Town of Northfield, VT. (esb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michael Gero, Brian Hoar, Town of Northfield, VT from Vermont Superior Court, Washington Unit, Civil Division, case number unknown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Notice of Filing, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Service) (esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kew v. Town of Northfield, VT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Hoar
Represented By: Michael J. Leddy, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gero
Represented By: Michael J. Leddy, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Northfield, VT
Represented By: Michael J. Leddy, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Kew
Represented By: Ronald A. Shems, Esq.
Represented By: Stephen F. Coteus, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?