Monder et al v. Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Monder and Pamela Monder
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company and Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00090
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATED DISCOVERY LETTER SENT re: no stipulated discovery schedule filed; case will be set for a scheduling conference unless stipulated schedule is filed. (pjl)
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Count II and MOTION to Strike Paragraphs 24 and 25 of Complaint filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Burkhouse, Nolan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing of #1 Notice of Removal by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service) (originally filed 6/3/2019 in state court) (esb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. filed by Pamela Monder, Jeffrey Monder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (originally filed 4/9/2019 in state court) (esb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (esb)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Count II and MOTION to Strike Paragraphs 24 and 25 of Complaint, #7 MOTION to Dismiss Liberty Mutual Group, Inc as Defendant. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2019 at 09:00 AM in Rutland Courtroom before Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. (esb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pamela Monder.(Louttit, Eric)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Count III and MOTION to Strike Paragraphs 24 and 25 of Complaint filed by Pamela Monder. (Louttit, Eric) Text clarified on 7/10/2019 (jlh).
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION re: #7 Motion to Dismiss and to Strike by Pamela Monder (Louttit, Eric) Link added on 7/9/2019 (jlh).
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: #7 Motion to Dismiss by Pamela Monder.(Louttit, Eric) Link added on 7/9/2019 (jlh)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Liberty Mutual Group, Inc as Defendant filed by Pamela Monder.(Louttit, Eric)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Count III and MOTION to Strike Paragraphs 24 and 25 of Complaint filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Certificate of Service)(Burkhouse, Nolan). Added MOTION to Strike on 6/10/2019 (law). Text clarified on 7/10/2019 (jlh).
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 WITHDRAWAL of #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Burkhouse, Nolan)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Burkhouse, Nolan)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Rutland Unit, Civil Division requesting a certified copy of the docket sheet and the complete original file. (esb)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. (esb)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. from Vermont Superior Court, Rutland Unit, Civil Division, case number 187-4-19 Rdcv. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monder et al v. Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Nolan C. Burkhouse, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.
Represented By: Nolan C. Burkhouse, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Monder
Represented By: Eric S. Louttit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Monder
Represented By: Eric S. Louttit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?