Signor et al v. Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Krista Signor and Sandra Signor
Defendant: Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company and IAT Insurance Group
Not Yet Classified: ENE Evaluator
Case Number: 5:2019cv00101
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 23 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs and First Request for Production of Documents of Plaintiffs by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company, IAT Insurance Group.(Smith, Jr., Shapleigh)
August 8, 2019 Filing 22 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Initial Disclosures by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company, IAT Insurance Group.(Smith, Jr., Shapleigh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY REMOVAL: Document 20 has been removed from the docket as entered in the incorrect case. (law)
July 31, 2019 Filing 20 Entry removed from the docket.
July 30, 2019 Filing 19 ASSIGNED Early Neutral Evaluator: Gregory S. Clayton, Esq. (eh)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE/ORDER Discovery due by 3/1/2020. Motions due by 3/1/2020. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 11/19/2019. Ready for Trial by 4/1/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 7/29/2019. (esb)
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 PROPOSED Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company, IAT Insurance Group.(Smith, Jr., Shapleigh)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting MOTIONS for Pro Hac Vice #13 of Eric B. Hermanson and #14 of Austin D. Moody. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 7/9/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 7/26/2019. (eh)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Austin D. Moody filed by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company, IAT Insurance Group. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Austin D. Moody, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Service)(jlh)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Eric B. Hermanson filed by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company, IAT Insurance Group. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eric B. Hermanson, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company, IAT Insurance Group.(Smith, Jr., Shapleigh)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. IAT Insurance Group served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (originally filed 5/22/2019 in state court) (pac)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (originally filed 5/22/2019 in state court) (pac)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 UPDATED AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE with 12 V.S.A. 856 by Krista Signor, Sandra Signor. (originally filed 5/22/2019 in state court) (pac)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE with 12 V.S.A. 856 by Krista Signor, Sandra Signor (originally filed 5/20/2019 in state court) (Attachments: #1 Summons) (pac)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company, IAT Insurance Group filed by Sandra Signor, Krista Signor. (originally filed 5/3/2019 in state court) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (pac)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (pac)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #4 Letter. The document has been replaced to correct the attorney to be billed. The corrected document is now attached to #4 and this entry. (law)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Grand Isle Unit requesting certified copy of the docket sheet and complete original file. (pjl) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/13/2019) (law).
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by IAT Insurance Group. (pjl)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. (pjl)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by IAT Insurance Group, Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company from Vermont Superior Court, Grand Isle Unit, case number 27-5-19 Gicv. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (pjl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Signor et al v. Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krista Signor
Represented By: Thomas C. Nuovo, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Signor
Represented By: Thomas C. Nuovo, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Shapleigh Smith, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Eric B. Hermanson, Esq.
Represented By: Austin D. Moody, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAT Insurance Group
Represented By: Shapleigh Smith, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Eric B. Hermanson, Esq.
Represented By: Austin D. Moody, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ENE Evaluator
Represented By: Gregory S. Clayton, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?