Barnett v. Houle et al
Plaintiff: Richard Darnell Barnett
Defendant: Barre, City of, Jonathan Houle and City of Barre
Not Yet Classified: ENE Evaluator
Case Number: 5:2019cv00110
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 ASSIGNED Early Neutral Evaluator: Donald (Tad) R. Powers, Esq. (eh)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 EVALUATOR SELECTION Response by City of Barre, Jonathan Houle(Leddy, Michael)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 8/12/2019. (eh)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY REMOVAL. Attachment 2 has been removed from #3 Answer to Complaint and entered as a separate entry. See #4 Notice of Appearance. (jlh)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael J. Leddy, Esq on behalf of City of Barre, Jonathan Houle. (esb)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by City of Barre, Jonathan Houle. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Leddy, Michael) (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/24/2019) (jlh).
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Richard Darnell Barnett. (esb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Barre, Jonathan Houle filed by Richard Darnell Barnett. Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnett v. Houle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barre, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Houle
Represented By: Michael J. Leddy, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Barre
Represented By: Michael J. Leddy, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Darnell Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ENE Evaluator
Represented By: Donald (Tad) R. Powers, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?