Wind River Environmental, LLC v. Melanson et al
Plaintiff: Wind River Environmental, LLC
Defendant: N.A. Manosh Inc. and Michael Melanson
Not Yet Classified: ENE Evaluator
Case Number: 5:2019cv00111
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 43 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction held on 7/31/2019, before Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anne Henry, telephone number 802-747-9193. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/16/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2019. (pjl)
August 19, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Hearing re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Hearing set for 8/29/2019 at 2:00 PM in Rutland Courtroom before Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. (pjl)
August 16, 2019 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Melanson, N.A. Manosh Inc. re #40 .(Stevens, III, Harold)
August 16, 2019 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim For Relief filed by Michael Melanson, N.A. Manosh Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stevens, III, Harold)
August 15, 2019 Filing 39 ASSIGNED Early Neutral Evaluator: Michael J. Marks, Esq. (eh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 38 EVALUATOR SELECTION Response by Wind River Environmental, LLC(Towle, William)
August 14, 2019 Filing 37 STIPULATION AS TO ENE by all parties.(Towle, William)
August 9, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wind River Environmental, LLC re #35 Response to Motion for Judgment.(Towle, William)
August 9, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition to #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wind River Environmental, LLC. (Towle, William)
July 31, 2019 Filing 34 OFFICIAL JOINT WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST for hearing held on 7/31/2019. (pjl)
July 31, 2019 Filing 33 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford: Motion Hearing held on 7/31/2019 re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. S. Torres, Esq. & W. Towle, Esq. present for plaintiff. H. Stevens, III, Esq. present for defendants. Clerk swears Jennifer Sadusky and Michael Medor as witnesses for plaintiff. Plaintiff rests. Clerk swears Nick Manosh and Michael Melanson as witnesses for defendants. Defendants rest. Counsel make statements. Court makes findings on the record. ORDERED: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is denied. (Court Reporter: Anne Henry) (pjl)
July 30, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY REMOVAL: Document 16 has been removed from the docket as it was unsigned. See #27 for corrected document. (law)
July 30, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. N.A. Manosh Corporation served on 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Towle, William) Text clarified on 7/31/2019 (law).
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Affidavits. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 7/30/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
July 29, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Melanson, N.A. Manosh Inc. re #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Affidavits, #25 Affidavit, #28 Response to Motion, #27 Waiver of Service Returned Executed, #26 Affidavit.(Stevens, III, Harold)
July 29, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Michael Melanson, N.A. Manosh Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Stevens, III, Harold)
July 29, 2019 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: N.A. Manosh Inc., Michael Melanson waiver sent on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019.(Stevens, III, Harold) Text clarified on 7/30/2019 (law).
July 29, 2019 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Michael Melanson by Michael Melanson, N.A. Manosh Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stevens, III, Harold) Link removed, text clarified on 7/30/2019 (law).
July 29, 2019 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Nick Manosh by Michael Melanson, N.A. Manosh Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Stevens, III, Harold) Link removed, text clarified on 7/30/2019 (law).
July 29, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Affidavits filed by Michael Melanson, N.A. Manosh Inc. (Stevens, III, Harold) Event/text clarified on 7/30/2019 (law).
July 29, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #15 Affidavit of Jennifer Sadusky filed by Wind River Environmental, LLC. The exhibits were combined with the affidavit into one document. They have been broken apart and are now separately attached to Document #15 and this entry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (law)
July 29, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wind River Environmental, LLC re #15 Affidavit of Jennifer Sadusky, #14 Affidavit of Michael Medor.(Towle, William)
July 29, 2019 Filing 21 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 8/15/2019. (eh)
July 26, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #14 Affidavit filed by Wind River Environmental, LLC. The main document and Supplemental Affidavit of Michael Medor were combined with their exhibits. They have been broken apart and are now separately attached to Document #14 and this entry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Supplemental Affidavit of Michael Medor, #13 Exhibit 1) (law)
July 26, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Melanson, N.A. Manosh Inc. re #17 Answer to Complaint, #18 Corporate Disclosure Statement.(Stevens, III, Harold)
July 26, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by N.A. Manosh Inc. (Stevens, III, Harold)
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Michael Melanson, N.A. Manosh Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Stevens, III, Harold) Event/text clarified on 7/29/2019 (law).
July 26, 2019 Filing 16 Entry removed from the docket.
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Jennifer Sadusky with Redacted Exhibits by Wind River Environmental, LLC (Attachments: #1 Hearing Submission)(Towle, William) (Main Document 15 replaced and Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2019: #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H) (law).
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Michael Medor by Wind River Environmental, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael Medor (Supplement), #2 Attachment Plaintiffs' Hearing Submission)(Towle, William) (Main Document 14 and Attachment 1 replaced on 7/26/2019) (law). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2019: #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit D, #11 Exhibit E, #12 Exhibit F, #13 Exhibit G, #14 Exhibit H, #15 Exhibit I, #16 Exhibit J, #17 Exhibit K, #18 Exhibit 1) (law).
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Melanson, N.A. Manosh Inc. re #12 Notice of Appearance.(Stevens, III, Harold)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harold B. Stevens, III, Esq on behalf of Michael Melanson, N.A. Manosh Inc.(Stevens, III, Harold) (Attachment 1 removed on 7/30/2019) (law). (Main Document 12 replaced as original upload was in edit mode on 8/15/2019) (law).
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Michael Melanson served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Towle, William) Text clarified on 7/24/2019 (jlh).
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Steven J. Torres. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 7/23/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATED MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Steven J. Torres filed by Wind River Environmental, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steven J. Torres, #2 Exhibit A)(law)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENTRY ORDER: re #6 Hearing on #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Exhibit List due by 7/26/2019. Affidavits re: testimony of any witness due by 7/26/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 7/9/2019. (esb)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 MOTION to Expedite Oral Argument. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 7/3/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Hearing set for 7/31/2019 at 1:30 PM in Rutland Courtroom before Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. (pjl)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Expedite Oral Argument re: #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Wind River Environmental, LLC. (esb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Wind River Environmental, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Affidavit of Michael Medor, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Affidavit of Jennifer Sadusky, #15 Exhibit A, #16 Exhibit B, #17 Exhibit C, #18 Exhibit D, #19 Exhibit E, #20 Exhibit F, #21 Exhibit G)(esb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Wind River Environmental, LLC (esb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William B. Towle on behalf of Wind River Environmental, LLC. (esb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Melanson, N.A. Manosh Inc. filed by Wind River Environmental, LLC.Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wind River Environmental, LLC v. Melanson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wind River Environmental, LLC
Represented By: William B. Towle
Represented By: Steven J. Torres, Esq.
Represented By: William B. Towle, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.A. Manosh Inc.
Represented By: Harold B. Stevens, III, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Melanson
Represented By: Harold B. Stevens, III, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ENE Evaluator
Represented By: Michael J. Marks, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?